Irick v. Mays
Petitioner: Billy Ray Irick
Respondent: Tony Mays
Interested Party: Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals
Case Number: 3:2018cv00737
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: In light of the execution of Billy Ray Irick, this case is dismissed. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/17/2018. (jw)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/8/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
August 8, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing by Billy Ray Irick of Correspondence from Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A Klienfelter Letter)(Henry, Kelley) Modified on 8/8/2018 (af).
August 8, 2018 Filing 14 SURREPLY re #6 Emergency Motion for Leave to Service Subpoena Duces Tecum Instanter filed by Tony Mays. (af)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/8/18. (af)
August 8, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to to File Surreply by Tony Mays. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Surreply)(Bledsoe, John)
August 8, 2018 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY to Response to Motion #6 filed by Billy Ray Irick. (Henry, Kelley) Modified on 8/8/2018 (af).
August 8, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion #6 filed by Billy Ray Irick. (Henry, Kelley) Modified on 8/8/2018 (af).
August 8, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum Instanter filed by Tony Mays. (Bledsoe, John) Modified on 8/8/2018 (af).
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Defendant shall file a response to the Emergency Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum Instanter (Doc. No. 6) by 2:00 p.m. today. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/8/18. (af)
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING Response of Governor's Legal Counsel Regarding Mr. Irick's Request for the Production of Testing Results of Compounded Drugs and Page 35 of the Lethal Injection Protocol. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email, #2 Exhibit page 35)(Henry, Kelley) Modified on 8/8/2018 (af).
August 8, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Henry Alan Martin, Kelley J. Henry and John H. Bledsoe, III. (jw)
August 8, 2018 Filing 6 Revised Emergency Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum Instanter to Warden Tony Mays by Billy Ray Irick . (Henry, Kelley) Modified on 8/8/2018 (af). (Attachment: Email from Kelley Henry to Dwight Tarwater dated 8/8/18 at 8:13 AM.
August 8, 2018 Filing 5 Emergency Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum Instanter to Warden Tony Mays by Billy Ray Irick. (Henry, Kelley) Modified on 8/8/2018 (af).
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Bledsoe, III on behalf of Tony Mays (Bledsoe, John)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelley J. Henry on behalf of Billy Ray Irick (Henry, Kelley)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and to appoint counsel. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/7/18. (af)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Appointment of Counsel filed by Billy Ray Irick. (af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irick v. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tony Mays
Represented By: John H. Bledsoe, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Billy Ray Irick
Represented By: Henry Alan Martin
Represented By: Kelley J. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?