United States of America v. Warner
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Robert Warner, III
Case Number: 3:2018cv00739
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by United States of America. Robert Warner, III served on 8/10/2018. (Phillips, Debra)
September 28, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Stephen P. Jordan. (gb)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Jordan on behalf of United States of America (Jordan, Stephen)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Case Management Conference RESET for 10/30/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. A proposed case management order shall be filed 3 days before the conference. Additionally, the proposed order shall also be emailed to chambers at Shannon_lumpkin-ray@tnmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 9/11/18. (gb)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/8/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Robert Warner, III. (gb)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (gb)
August 7, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Debra Teufel Phillips. (gb)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Warner, III, filed by United States of America. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Indebtedness, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Warner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Debra Teufel Phillips
Represented By: Stephen P. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?