Cathey et al v. WalMart, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Roger D. Cathey and Joann Cathey
Defendant: WalMart, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 3:2018cv00743
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Dickson
0 Judge: William L Campbell
1 Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2018 8 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by All Plaintiffs. (Honeycutt, Mark)
August 29, 2018 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Manning, Allison)
August 9, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER referring case to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/9/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
August 8, 2018 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
August 8, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Thomas J. Hendrickson, III, Mark W. Honeycutt, II, Allison D. Manning, and Gregory W. Callaway. (mg)
August 8, 2018 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
August 8, 2018 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Business Entity Disclosure by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,)(mg)
August 8, 2018 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WalMart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service)(mg)
August 8, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, WalMart, Inc. from Circuit Court for Dickson County, Tennessee, case number 22CC-2018-CV-64. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2726934) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons to Walmart, Inc., #3 Exhibit B - Summons to Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, #4 Exhibit C - Complaint)(mg) Modified text on 8/8/2018 (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cathey et al v. WalMart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger D. Cathey
Represented By: Mark W. Honeycutt, II
Represented By: Thomas J. Hendrickson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Cathey
Represented By: Mark W. Honeycutt, II
Represented By: Thomas J. Hendrickson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WalMart, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory W. Callaway
Represented By: Allison D. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Gregory W. Callaway
Represented By: Allison D. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?