Global Force Entertainment, Inc. et al v. Anthem Sports & Entertainment Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Jarrett and Global Force Entertainment, Inc.
Defendant: Anthem Sports & Entertainment Corp. and Anthem Wrestling Exhibitions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00749
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Paige Waldrop Mills. (gb)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Defts' #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Pltfs' Complaint; Anthem Sports & Entertainment Corp. answer due 10/15/2018; Anthem Wrestling Exhibitions, LLC answer due 10/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 9/14/18. (rd)
September 13, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Anthem Sports & Entertainment Corp. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Mills, Paige)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Expedited discovery. Counsel has not shown that service of process has even been made on the defendants. Although there is mention of correspondence with counsel for the defendants on August 10, the motion was not sent to that attorney but only to a registered agent for the defendants. Plaintiff has not shown that it cannot get an extension from the copyright office. There is no memorandum of law accompanying the motion as required by the local rules. If the court issued the requested order it would have no idea who to send it to other than the registered agent for service of process. (xc:Pro se party by certified mail. ) (JBB) Modified on 8/28/2018 (rd).
August 24, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Discovery VERY LIMITED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, MOTION to Expedite Determination of Motion by Global Force Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copyright Office Receipts)(Miller, Samuel)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/14/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 Summons issued as to Anthem Sports & Entertainment Corp. and Anthem Wrestling Exhibitions, LLC. (gb)
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (gb)
August 10, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Samuel F. Miller, Nicholas R. Valenti and A. Grace Van Dyke James. (gb)
August 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jeffrey Jarrett. (gb)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Global Force Entertainment, Inc. (gb)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthem Sports & Entertainment Corp., Anthem Wrestling Exhibitions, LLC (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-2728477), filed by Global Force Entertainment, Inc., Jeffrey Jarrett. Summons not provided. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 - Fight Network Screen Capture, #2 Exhibit 4 - Impact! Screen Capture, #3 Exhibit 5 - GWN Screen Capture, #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Force Entertainment, Inc. et al v. Anthem Sports & Entertainment Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Jarrett
Represented By: Nicholas R. Valenti
Represented By: A. Grace Van Dyke James
Represented By: Samuel F. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Force Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas R. Valenti
Represented By: A. Grace Van Dyke James
Represented By: Samuel F. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Sports & Entertainment Corp.
Represented By: Paige Waldrop Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Wrestling Exhibitions, LLC
Represented By: Paige Waldrop Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?