Diamond Resorts International, Inc. et al v. Austin
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts Corporation and Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC
Defendant: Sean Kingslow Austin
Interested Party: Matt Loughney, Teresa Azan and Lauren Langston
Case Number: 3:2018cv00795
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated, per Order #12 . (dt)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Motion to Withdraw the Reference #1 is hereby GRANTED. The dischargeability of any debt determined to be owed by Mr. Austin in the related district court action, Case No. 3:17-cv-1124, will perforce be determined in that complex case that was filed in August 2017 against numerous defendants, only one of which is the debtor, Mr. Austin. The role and potential liability of Mr. Austin simply cannot be determined in an isolated action in the Bankruptcy Court. Therefore, despite the fact that this adversary action is a core proceeding, it is in the interest of judicial economy, costs to the parties, and avoidance of the risks of conflicting dispositions that the matters at issue in the adversary proceeding be determined in tandem with the pending district court action. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/17/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service filed by Sean Kingslow Austin. (Dunham, Griffin)
September 19, 2018 Notice to Filer re DE #3 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, all filings shall include a Certificate of Service and it shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel SHALL FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document using the Certificate event located under Other Documents. (dt)
September 14, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service (Amended) filed by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC re #5 MOTION for attorney(s) Glennys Ortega Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2751044) filed by Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC, #6 MOTION for attorney(s) Alfred J. Bennington, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2751070) filed by Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Rubin, Glennys)
September 13, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Griffin S. Dunham. (dt)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Alfred J. Bennington, Jr to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/13/18. (dt) Modified on 9/13/2018 (dt).
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Glennys Ortega Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/13/18. (dt) Modified on 9/13/2018 (dt).
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McMullen, Austin)
September 13, 2018 Notice to Filer re DE #5 - #6 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, all filings shall include a Certificate of Service and it shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel SHALL FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document using the Certificate event located under Other Documents. (dt)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney(s) Alfred J. Bennington, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2751070) by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Bennington, Alfred)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney(s) Glennys Ortega Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2751044) by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Rubin, Glennys)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Griffin S. Dunham on behalf of Sean Kingslow Austin (Dunham, Griffin)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Sean Kingslow Austin. (Dunham, Griffin)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 176, this action is transferred to U.S. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger as a "Related Case" to Civil Action No. 3:17-cv-01124. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/29/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 24, 2018 Copy of docket sheet mailed to pro se defendant Sean Kingslow Austin. (af)
August 24, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Alfred J. Bennington, Jr & Glennys Ortega Rubin: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/14/2018. (af)
August 24, 2018 FL State Bar status verified as active for Alfred J. Bennington, Jr, & Glennys Ortega Rubin. (af)
August 24, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for William L. Norton, III, Austin L. McMullen, & R. Eddie Wayland. (af)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference filed by Diamond Resorts et al. (Attachments: #1 Attachment USBC Docket Sheet)(af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond Resorts International, Inc. et al v. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Matt Loughney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Teresa Azan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Lauren Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts International, Inc.
Represented By: R. Eddie Wayland
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Austin L. McMullen
Represented By: William L. Norton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts Management, Inc.
Represented By: R. Eddie Wayland
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Austin L. McMullen
Represented By: William L. Norton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts Corporation
Represented By: R. Eddie Wayland
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Austin L. McMullen
Represented By: William L. Norton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC
Represented By: R. Eddie Wayland
Represented By: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Austin L. McMullen
Represented By: William L. Norton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Kingslow Austin
Represented By: Griffin S. Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?