Tekoppel v. Harpeth Financial Services, LLC

Plaintiff: Nicol Tekoppel
Defendant: Harpeth Financial Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00805
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
0 Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
1 Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER: The parties' Stipulation is GRANTED. This case is STAYED pending the completion of arbitration in accordance with the parties' agreement. The Clerk shall administratively close the file, which is subject to re-opening upon Motion by any party. The parties shall file a joint status report no later than 14 days after the conclusion of the arbitration proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/10/18. (dt)
October 9, 2018 13 STIPULATION to Arbitration Claims and Stay Lawsuit (Joint) by Nicol Tekoppel. (Kerney, Frank)
October 2, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Austin K. Purvis and Scott D. Carey. (gb)
October 1, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER: On September 26, 2018, Defendant filed a motion to dismiss and to compel arbitration. ( #8 ) Any response is to be filed within 14 days after service of the motion. A reply memorandum not to exceed five pages may be filed within 7 days after service of the response. Any filings made related to the motion to dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Judge Crenshaw unless referred to the undersigned magistrate judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/1/18. (gb)
October 1, 2018 11 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference RESET for 1/29/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Counsel shall submit a proposed initial case management order three (3) business days prior to the conference. (gb)
September 26, 2018 10 DECLARATION of Shelby Patterson filed by Harpeth Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Acct. Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - EFT Authorization, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Consent)(Purvis, Austin)
September 26, 2018 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration filed by Harpeth Financial Services, LLC. (Purvis, Austin)
September 26, 2018 8 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration by Harpeth Financial Services, LLC. (Purvis, Austin)
September 13, 2018 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Nicol Tekoppel. Harpeth Financial Services, LLC served on 9/4/2018. (Kerney, Frank)
September 5, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/5/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
August 29, 2018 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt)
August 29, 2018 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
August 29, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher K. Thompson. FL State Bar status verified as active for Frank H. Kerney, III. (dt)
August 29, 2018 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
August 29, 2018 2 Summons issued as to Harpeth Financial Services, LLC. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.)(dt) Modified on 8/29/2018 (dt).
August 29, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Harpeth Financial Services, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2741179), filed by Nicol Tekoppel. (Attachments: #1 Attachment -civil cover sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tekoppel v. Harpeth Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicol Tekoppel
Represented By: Christopher K. Thompson
Represented By: Frank H. Kerney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harpeth Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Austin K. Purvis
Represented By: Scott D. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?