Home Educating Family Association, LLC v. MFW Books, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Home Educating Family Association, LLC
Defendant: MFW Books, LLC, David Hazell and My Father's World
Case Number: 3:2018cv00808
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
0 Judge: Barbara D Holmes
1 Judge: Eli J Richardson
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/25/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to the division of the docket, this case is transferred to Judge Eli J. Richardson. All previously imposed deadlines and court dates remain unchanged, pending any further order from Judge Richardson. The initial case management conference scheduled for November 19, 2018 before Judge Trauger is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/18/2018. (jw)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER granting #11 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. The initial case management conference is RESET for 11/19/2018 at 3:15 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/28/18. (gb)
September 27, 2018 11 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference to November 19, 2018 by David Hazell, MFW Books, LLC, My Father's World. (O'Rear, Howell)
September 17, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Howell G. O'Rear and Seth Martin McInteer. (jw)
September 13, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Martin McInteer on behalf of All Defendants (McInteer, Seth)
September 13, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Howell G. O'Rear on behalf of All Defendants (O'Rear, Howell)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/11/2018. (jw)
September 11, 2018 NC State Bar status verified as active for Anthony J. Biller. (jw)
September 10, 2018 7 MOTION for attorney(s) Anthony J. Biller to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2748963) by David Hazell, MFW Books, LLC, My Father's World. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Biller, Anthony)
August 30, 2018 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Home Educating Family Association, LLC. (Johnson, Michael)
August 30, 2018 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2018 at 2:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
August 30, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for John J. Griffin, Jr, and Michael A. Johnson. (mg)
August 30, 2018 4 Summons issued as to David Hazell, MFW Books, LLC, My Father's World. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
August 30, 2018 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
August 30, 2018 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
August 29, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against David Hazell, MFW Books, LLC, My Father's World (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2741824), filed by Home Educating Family Association, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cease and Desist, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home Educating Family Association, LLC v. MFW Books, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home Educating Family Association, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Johnson
Represented By: John J. Griffin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MFW Books, LLC
Represented By: Anthony J. Biller
Represented By: Howell G. O'Rear
Represented By: Seth Martin McInteer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hazell
Represented By: Anthony J. Biller
Represented By: Howell G. O'Rear
Represented By: Seth Martin McInteer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My Father's World
Represented By: Anthony J. Biller
Represented By: Howell G. O'Rear
Represented By: Seth Martin McInteer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?