Kinman v. Burnop et al

Plaintiff: Donald Matthew Kinman
Defendant: Zachary Burnop and 3B Filmz, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00809
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
1 Judge: Eli J Richardson
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/25/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Donald Matthew Kinman. (Modak-Truran, Anita)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Donald Matthew Kinman. 3B Filmz, Inc. served on 10/5/2018; Zachary Burnop served on 10/5/2018. (Modak-Truran, Anita)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to the division of the docket, this case is transferred to Judge Eli J. Richardson. All previously imposed deadlines and court dates remain unchanged, pending any further order from Judge Richardson. The initial case management conference scheduled for October 29, 2018 before Judge Trauger is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/18/18. (gb)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 Summons issued as to 3B Filmz, Inc. and Zachary Burnop. (gb)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2018 at 02:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (gb)
August 30, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Anita K. Modak-Truran. (gb)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3B Filmz, Inc., Zachary Burnop (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-2741867), filed by Donald Matthew Kinman. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B - Production Budget, #3 Exhibit C - Payments from Kinman to Defendants, #4 Exhibit D - Contract, #5 Exhibit E - Advertisement of Project on Internet, #6 Exhibit F - Kinman Affidavit, #7 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinman v. Burnop et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Matthew Kinman
Represented By: Anita K. Modak-Truran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Burnop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3B Filmz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?