Amodio et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Aryana Olson Amodio and Frank Emil Amodio, Jr.
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Wilson & Associates PLLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00811
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER: Given the pendency of a Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. #7 ), it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for October 29, 2018 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, following disposition of this motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/23/2018. (jm)
October 22, 2018 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 Response in Opposition to Motion, #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Aryana Olson Amodio, Frank Emil Amodio, Jr . (Slocum, Keith)
October 22, 2018 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Aryana Olson Amodio, Frank Emil Amodio, Jr. (Slocum, Keith)
October 11, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jessica Jernigan-Johnson, Heather Howell Wright and Gerald D. Morgan. (jm)
October 9, 2018 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Jernigan-Johnson, Jessica)
October 9, 2018 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Jernigan-Johnson, Jessica)
October 8, 2018 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Wilson & Associates PLLC. (Morgan, Gerald)
October 8, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald D. Morgan on behalf of Wilson & Associates PLLC (Morgan, Gerald)
August 31, 2018 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2018 at 4:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jw)
August 31, 2018 4 Summons issued as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Wilson & Associates PLLC. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
August 31, 2018 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
August 31, 2018 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw)
August 31, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Keith D. Slocum. (jw)
August 29, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Wilson & Associates PLLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2741669), filed by Frank Emil Amodio, Jr, Aryana Olson Amodio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - WA Letter 7/26/2017, #3 Exhibit 2 - WU to OLSC 7/31/2017, #4 Exhibit 3 - Sub Trustee Wilson and Associates, #5 Exhibit 4 - Trustee Deed Young 9/11/2017, #6 Exhibit 5 - SPS Letter 12/5/2017, #7 Exhibit 6 - SPS Deed Release 11/17/2017, #8 Exhibit 7 - OLS Notice of Foreclosure, #9 Exhibit 8 - Deed of Trust, #10 Exhibit 9 - Phone Records)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amodio et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Heather Howell Wright
Represented By: Jessica Jernigan-Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson & Associates PLLC
Represented By: Gerald D. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aryana Olson Amodio
Represented By: Keith D. Slocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Emil Amodio, Jr.
Represented By: Keith D. Slocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?