Barcade Holdings, LLC v. The Gold Digger Barcade & Lounge, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Barcade Holdings, LLC
Defendant: The Gold Digger Barcade & Lounge, LLC and Byrl Hampe
Case Number: 3:2018cv00816
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Request for Entry of Default filed by Barcade Holdings, LLC re: #16 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant's. (Brittian, R.)
October 11, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant's by Barcade Holdings, LLC. (Brittian, R.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed by Barcade Holdings, LLC. Byrl Hampe served on 9/12/2018. (Brittian, R.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed by Barcade Holdings, LLC. The Gold Digger Barcade & Lounge, LLC served on 9/12/2018. (Brittian, R.)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Melanie A. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/11/2018. (mg)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Brianne L. Polito to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/11/2018. (mg)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Camille M. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/11/2018. (mg)
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney(s) Melanie A. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2749753) by Barcade Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Brittian, R.)
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney(s) Brianne L. Polito to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2749740) by Barcade Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Brittian, R.)
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney(s) Camille M. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2749711) by Barcade Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Brittian, R.)
September 11, 2018 PA State Bar status verified as active for Brianne L. Polito, Melanie A. Miller, and Camille M Miller. (mg)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/5/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Byrl Hampe, The Gold Digger Barcade & Lounge, LLC. (Attorney R. Bradford Brittian sent service packets by regular mail). (am)
September 4, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Brianne L. Polito, Melanie A. Miller, Camille M Miller: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/25/2018. (am)
September 4, 2018 TN & PA State Bar status verified as active for R. Bradford Brittian, John T. Winemiller, Brianne L. Polito, Melanie A. Miller, Camille M Miller. (am)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Barcade Holdings, LLC. (am)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Byrl Hampe, The Gold Digger Barcade & Lounge, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2742711), filed by Barcade Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barcade Holdings, LLC v. The Gold Digger Barcade & Lounge, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barcade Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Brianne L. Polito
Represented By: R. Bradford Brittian
Represented By: Camille M Miller
Represented By: John T. Winemiller
Represented By: Melanie A. Miller
Represented By: Camille M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gold Digger Barcade & Lounge, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byrl Hampe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?