Rawson v. The Murkin Group, LLC

Plaintiff: Tracy Rawson
Defendant: The Murkin Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00832
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated per DE: #9 Stipulation, per Chambers. (am)
October 29, 2018 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tracy Rawson (Kaludis, William)
September 11, 2018 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Tracy Rawson. The Murkin Group, LLC served on 9/11/2018. (Kaludis, William)
September 10, 2018 7 Summons Reissued as to The Murkin Group, LLC. (Summons issued at the front counter.) (am)
September 10, 2018 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Tracy Rawson as to The Murkin Group, LLC. (Kaludis, William)
September 5, 2018 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2018 at 01:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
September 5, 2018 4 Summons issued as to The Murkin Group, LLC. (Attorney William Kaludis sent service packets by regular mail.) (am)
September 5, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for William M. Kaludis, Brent S. Snyder. (am)
September 4, 2018 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
September 4, 2018 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
September 4, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against The Murkin Group, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2744945), filed by Tracy Rawson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - Initial Demand)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rawson v. The Murkin Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Rawson
Represented By: Brent S. Snyder
Represented By: William M. Kaludis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Murkin Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?