Family Trust Services LLC et al v. Walker et al

Plaintiff: Mr. Steven Reigle, Billy Gregory, Carl Chambers, Regal Homes Co., John Sherrod and Family Trust Services LLC
Defendant: Jon Paul Johnson, Nationwide Investments LLC, Merdan Ibrahim, Julie Coone and Charles E. Walker
Case Number: 3:2018cv00859
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
0 Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
1 Judge: Barbara D Holmes
2 Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2018 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court or to Abstain filed by Carl Chambers, Family Trust Services LLC, Billy Gregory, Regal Homes Co., Steven Reigle, John Sherrod. (Krog, Paul)
October 25, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER: Pending before the Court are Defendant Walker's Motion for an Order to Show Cause (Doc. No. 4) and Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court or to Abstain (Doc. No. 12). These two motions are referred to the Magistrate Judge for decision or recommendation as appropriate. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/25/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
October 24, 2018 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court or to Abstain and Memorandum in Opposition filed by Charles E. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fourth Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs Order)(Walker, Charles)
October 22, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER: Pursuant to the division of the docket, this case is transferred to Judge Eli J. Richardson. All previously imposed deadlines and Court dates remain unchanged, pending any further order from Judge Richardson. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/22/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (gb)
October 10, 2018 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court or to Abstain filed by Carl Chambers, Family Trust Services LLC, Billy Gregory, Regal Homes Co., Steven Reigle, John Sherrod. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Close Case No. 3304, #2 Exhibit Order Appointing Trustee, #3 Exhibit Case No. 3:16-bk-3349 Docket, #4 Exhibit Walker's Brief Re: Effect of Removal)(Krog, Paul)
October 10, 2018 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court or to Abstain by Carl Chambers, Family Trust Services LLC, Billy Gregory, Regal Homes Co., Steven Reigle, John Sherrod. (Krog, Paul)
October 4, 2018 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Charles E. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Approved Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-1 7 Exhibits from AP filed by Plaintiffs objecting to Debtor's Discharge, #3 Exhibit B-2 7 Exhibits from AP filed by Plaintiffs objection to Debtor's discharge, #4 Exhibit C - Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed in bankruptcy case, #5 Exhibit D - Order Approving Settlement, #6 Exhibit E - Confirmed Chapter 11 Plan, #7 Exhibit F - Administrative Order)(Walker, Charles)
October 3, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/3/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
September 27, 2018 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Carl Chambers, Family Trust Services LLC, Billy Gregory, Regal Homes Co., Steven Reigle, John Sherrod. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Disclosure of Billy Gregory, #2 Attachment Disclosure of Carl Chambers, #3 Attachment Disclosure of Family Trust Services LLC, #4 Attachment Disclosure of Regal Homes Co., #5 Attachment Disclosure of Steven Reigle, #6 Attachment Disclosure of John Sherrod)(Krog, Paul)
September 27, 2018 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Carl Chambers, Family Trust Services LLC, Billy Gregory, Regal Homes Co., Steven Reigle, John Sherrod. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 3:17-cv-1361 Memo. & Order, #2 Exhibit 2-29-16 Petition, #3 Exhibit 11-24-15 Order of Formal Complaint & Recusal, #4 Exhibit BPR v. Walker Compl., #5 Exhibit Declaration of Maria Salas, #6 Exhibit Modified Temporary Injunction, #7 Exhibit Memo. & Order Granting Prejudgment Attachment, #8 Exhibit Partial Transcript, 7-12-16 Hr'g, #9 Exhibit 3-18-6 Probable Cause Order, #10 Exhibit 5-4-16 Order Dismissing Petition for Criminal Contempt, #11 Exhibit 4-5-16 Notice of Removal, #12 Exhibit 4-8-16 Order Striking Notice of Removal, #13 Exhibit 5-13-16 Notice of Removal, #14 Exhibit 9-13-18 Order Denying TNRAP 11 Application, #15 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #16 Exhibit Motion to Approve Settlement, #17 Exhibit Order Approving Settlement, #18 Exhibit Case No. 3304 Docket Sheet, #19 Exhibit Case No. 90130 Docket Sheet, #20 Exhibit 9-16-17 Agreed Order, #21 Exhibit Original Schedules, #22 Exhibit Amended Schedules, #23 Exhibit Further Amended Schedules, #24 Exhibit Creditor Mailing Matrix, #25 Exhibit 2-7-18 Order Dissolving Stay & Reopening Case No. 15-780-BC, #26 Exhibit Nationwide v. Pinnacle Order Granting Rule 11 Sanctions, #27 Exhibit Notice of Administrative Closing, #28 Exhibit Order... Closing Case, #29 Exhibit 2d Revised Ch. 11 Trustee's Plan of Reorganization, #30 Exhibit Disclosure Statement, #31 Exhibit Declaration of Paul Krog, #32 Exhibit Certificate of Service for Order Fixing Time)(Krog, Paul)
September 27, 2018 7 NOTICE by Carl Chambers, Family Trust Services LLC, Billy Gregory, Regal Homes Co., Steven Reigle, John Sherrod Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9027 (Krog, Paul)
September 24, 2018 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Memorandum in Support, #4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Carl Chambers, Family Trust Services LLC, Billy Gregory, Regal Homes Co., Steven Reigle, John Sherrod. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Paul Krog, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Krog, Paul)
September 13, 2018 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of #4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Charles E. Walker . (Walker, Charles)
September 13, 2018 4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Charles E. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Motion to Add Defendants State Court Proceedings)(Walker, Charles)
September 13, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Eugene N. Bulso, Jr, Paul J. Krog, Robert Redman Laser, III, Patrick B. Newsom, Paul J. Bruno and Charles E. Walker. (gb)
September 13, 2018 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
September 13, 2018 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
September 13, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Charles E. Walker from Davidson County Chancery Court, case number 15-00780-BC. (Filing fee paid $400 receipt number 0650-2751787) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Add Defendants State Court Proceedings, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Family Trust Services LLC et al v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Steven Reigle
Represented By: Eugene N. Bulso, Jr.
Represented By: Paul J. Krog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Gregory
Represented By: Eugene N. Bulso, Jr.
Represented By: Paul J. Krog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Chambers
Represented By: Eugene N. Bulso, Jr.
Represented By: Paul J. Krog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regal Homes Co.
Represented By: Eugene N. Bulso, Jr.
Represented By: Paul J. Krog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sherrod
Represented By: Eugene N. Bulso, Jr.
Represented By: Paul J. Krog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Family Trust Services LLC
Represented By: Eugene N. Bulso, Jr.
Represented By: Paul J. Krog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Paul Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Investments LLC
Represented By: Patrick B. Newsom
Represented By: Paul J. Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merdan Ibrahim
Represented By: Robert Redman Laser, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Coone
Represented By: Robert Redman Laser, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E. Walker
Represented By: Charles E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?