Brown et al v. Knoxville HMA Holdings, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Garry Brown and John Hawkingberry
Defendant: Clarksville Health System, G.P., Knoxville HMA Holdings, LLC and Professional Account Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00861
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
0 Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
1 Judge: Eli J Richardson
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 20 Featured Case ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 1/22/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/9/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
November 8, 2018 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Clarksville Health System, G.P., Knoxville HMA Holdings, LLC, Professional Account Services, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Hospital Lien (Brown) dated Nov. 3, 2016, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Hospital Lien (Hawkingberry) dated Dec. 15, 2017, #3 Exhibit C - Conditions of Admission and Consent to Medical Treatment between Plaintiff Brown and Hospital, #4 Exhibit D - Conditions of Admission and Consent to Medical Treatment between Plaintiff Hawkingberry and Hospital)(Burkhalter, Stuart)
November 8, 2018 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Clarksville Health System, G.P., Knoxville HMA Holdings, LLC, Professional Account Services, Inc.. (Burkhalter, Stuart)
October 29, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference is set for 12/5/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/29/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
October 25, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/25/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
October 25, 2018 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against Clarksville Health System, G.P., Knoxville HMA Holdings, LLC, Professional Account Services, Inc., filed by John Hawkingberry, Garry Brown.(Gastel, Benjamin)
October 18, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to the division of the docket, this case is transferred to Judge Eli J. Richardson. All previously imposed deadlines and court dates remain unchanged, pending any further order from Judge Richardson. The initial case management conference scheduled for November 19, 2018 before Judge Trauger is hereby CANCELLED. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/18/2018. (jm)
October 16, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/16/18. (dt)
October 12, 2018 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Unopposed) by Garry Brown, John Hawkingberry. (Gastel, Benjamin)
October 4, 2018 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Clarksville Health System, G.P., Knoxville HMA Holdings, LLC, Professional Account Services, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Hospital Lien (Brown) dated Nov. 3, 2016, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Hospital Lien (Hawkingberry) dated Dec. 15, 2017)(Burkhalter, Stuart)
October 4, 2018 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Clarksville Health System, G.P., Knoxville HMA Holdings, LLC, Professional Account Services, Inc.. (Burkhalter, Stuart)
September 17, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint. Clarksville Health System, G.P. answer due 10/4/2018; Knoxville HMA Holdings, LLC answer due 10/4/2018; Professional Account Services, Inc. answer due 10/4/2018. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/17/2018. (jm)
September 17, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Benjamin A. Gastel, James Gerard Stranch, IV, John R. Jacobson, William M. Outhier, and Stuart A. Burkhalter. (jm)
September 17, 2018 8 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2018 at 01:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jm) Modified on 9/18/2018 (jm).
September 14, 2018 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Clarksville Health System, G.P., Knoxville HMA Holdings, LLC, Professional Account Services, Inc.. (Burkhalter, Stuart)
September 14, 2018 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Professional Account Services, Inc.. (Burkhalter, Stuart)
September 14, 2018 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Knoxville HMA Holdings, LLC. (Burkhalter, Stuart)
September 14, 2018 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Clarksville Health System, G.P.. (Burkhalter, Stuart)
September 13, 2018 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
September 13, 2018 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
September 13, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Clarksville Health System, G.P., Knoxville HMA Holdings, LLC, Professional Account Services, Inc. from Chancery Court for Montgomery County, Tennessee, case number MC-CH-CV-CD-18-27. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2752273) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Knoxville HMA Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarksville Health System, G.P.
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Represented By: Stuart A. Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knoxville HMA Holdings, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Represented By: Stuart A. Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Account Services, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Represented By: Stuart A. Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garry Brown
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hawkingberry
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?