Gossett v. Tennessee Partners XII, L.P. et al

Plaintiff: Alisa Gossett
Defendant: United Apartment Group, Tennessee Partners XII, L.P. and Angela Fann
Case Number: 3:2018cv00862
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
2 Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 1/29/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/7/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
November 6, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Alisa Gossett. (Crain, Larry)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Eli J. Richardson for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/19/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Alisa Gossett. Tennessee Partners XII, L.P. served on 10/9/2018. (Crain, Larry)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Alisa Gossett. Angela Fann served on 10/9/2018. (Crain, Larry)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 Summons issued as to Tennessee Partners XII, L.P. (registered agency) (Summons issued at the front counter.) (am)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Alisa Gossett. United Apartment Group served on 9/27/2018. (Crain, Larry)
October 5, 2018 Notice to Filer re DE 6 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Counsel shall re-file the document. (am)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 **DISREGARD**GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed Acknowledgement filed by Alisa Gossett. (Crain, Larry) Modified on 10/5/2018 (am).
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/17/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Angela Fann, Tennessee Partners XII, L.P., United Apartment Group. (Attorney Larry Crain sent service packets by regular mail.) (am)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
September 14, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Kathy T. Trawick: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 10/5/2018. (am)
September 14, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Larry Lamont Crain, Kathy T. Trawick. (am)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Angela Fann, Tennessee Partners XII, L.P., United Apartment Group (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2752428), filed by Alisa Gossett. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gossett v. Tennessee Partners XII, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Apartment Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Partners XII, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Fann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa Gossett
Represented By: Kathy T. Trawick
Represented By: Larry Lamont Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?