Horwitz v. Miller et al

Plaintiff: Harvey Horwitz
Defendant: Thomas D. Miller, William S. Hussey, R. Lawrence Van Horn, William M. Gracey, Adam Feinstein, Barbara R. Paul, James T. Breedlove, Michael J. Culotta, Joseph A. Hastings and Quorum Health Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv00875
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 10/26/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 23, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for James Auman Haltom. (dt)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: It appears that this case is related to Rao v. Quorum Health Corporation, et al., Case No. 3:16-cv-02475. For purposes of case management and judicial efficiency, the Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to transfer this case to Magistrate Judge Joe B. Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on October 23, 2018. (AN)
October 22, 2018 Filing 35 Joint MOTION to Stay and Agreed Stipulation Requesting Stay by James T. Breedlove, Michael J. Culotta, Adam Feinstein, William M. Gracey, Joseph A. Hastings, William S. Hussey, Thomas D. Miller, Barbara R. Paul, Quorum Health Corporation, R. Lawrence Van Horn. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order Granting Stay)(Haltom, James)
October 22, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by James Auman Haltom on behalf of All Defendants (Haltom, James)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Steve R. Wedeking to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/10/18. (dt)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Ashley R. Rifkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/10/18. (dt)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Brian J. Robbins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/10/18. (dt)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Craig W. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/10/18. (dt)
October 10, 2018 CA State Bar status verified as active for Brian J. Robbins, Craig W. Smith, Ashley R. Rifkin and Steven R. Wedeking. (dt)
October 9, 2018 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harvey Horwitz. William S. Hussey waiver sent on 9/20/2018. (Wood, Christopher)
October 9, 2018 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harvey Horwitz. William M. Gracey waiver sent on 9/20/2018. (Wood, Christopher)
October 9, 2018 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harvey Horwitz. Thomas D. Miller waiver sent on 9/20/2018. (Wood, Christopher)
October 9, 2018 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harvey Horwitz. Quorum Health Corporation waiver sent on 9/20/2018. (Wood, Christopher)
October 9, 2018 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harvey Horwitz. Michael J. Culotta waiver sent on 9/20/2018. (Wood, Christopher)
October 9, 2018 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harvey Horwitz. R. Lawrence Van Horn served on 9/20/2018. (Wood, Christopher) Modified on 10/10/2018 (dt).
October 9, 2018 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harvey Horwitz. Joseph A. Hastings waiver sent on 9/20/2018. (Wood, Christopher)
October 9, 2018 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harvey Horwitz. James T. Breedlove waiver sent on 9/20/2018. (Wood, Christopher)
October 9, 2018 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harvey Horwitz. Barbara R. Paul waiver sent on 9/20/2018. (Wood, Christopher)
October 9, 2018 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harvey Horwitz. Adam Feinstein waiver sent on 9/20/2018. (Wood, Christopher)
October 9, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney(s) Craig W. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2770590) by Harvey Horwitz. (Smith, Craig)
October 9, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney(s) Brian J. Robbins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2770586) by Harvey Horwitz. (Robbins, Brian)
October 9, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney(s) Ashley R. Rifkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2770584) by Harvey Horwitz. (Rifkin, Ashley)
October 9, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney(s) Steve R. Wedeking to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2770578) by Harvey Horwitz. (Wood, Christopher)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/4/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jw)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to Chief Judge Crenshaw, as it is related to an earlier-filed case assigned to him, 3:16-cv-2475. The initial case management conference scheduled before Judge Trauger on November 19, 2018 (Docket No. 7) is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/25/2018. (jw)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Erik W. Luedeke to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/24/18. (dt)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Benny C. Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/24/18. (dt)
September 24, 2018 CA State Bar status verified as active for Benny C. Goodman, III and Erik W. Luedeke. (dt)
September 21, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney(s) Erik W. Luedeke to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2759104) by Harvey Horwitz. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Luedeke, Erik)
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney(s) Benny C. Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2759097) by Harvey Horwitz. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Goodman, Benny)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/19/2018. (jw)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2018 at 1:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jw)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 Summons issued as to James T. Breedlove, Michael J. Culotta, Adam Feinstein, William M. Gracey, Joseph A. Hastings, William S. Hussey, Thomas D. Miller, Barbara R. Paul, Quorum Health Corporation, R. Lawrence Van Horn. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw)
September 19, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Brian J. Robbins, Craig W. Smith, Ashley R. Rifkin, Steven R. Wedeking, Benny C. Goodman, III, Erik W. Luedeke: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/10/2018. (jw)
September 19, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher M. Wood and Jerry E. Martin; CA State Bar status verified as active for Brian J. Robbins, Craig W. Smith, Ashley R. Rifkin, Steven R. Wedeking, Benny C. Goodman, III and Erik W. Luedeke. (jw)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 Sealed Document Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint for Violations of Securities Laws, Breach of Fiduciary Duty, Waste of Corporate Assets, and Unjust Enrichment filed by Harvey Horwitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Quorum Health Corporation Stockholder Inspection Demand)(Wood, Christopher)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint Under Seal by Harvey Horwitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confidentiality Agreement dated 6/28/2018)(Wood, Christopher)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James T. Breedlove, Michael J. Culotta, Adam Feinstein, William M. Gracey, Joseph A. Hastings, William S. Hussey, Thomas D. Miller, Barbara R. Paul, R. Lawrence Van Horn (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2754977), filed by Harvey Horwitz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Quorum Health Corporation Stockholder Inspection Demand)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horwitz v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas D. Miller
Represented By: James Auman Haltom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William S. Hussey
Represented By: James Auman Haltom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Lawrence Van Horn
Represented By: James Auman Haltom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M. Gracey
Represented By: James Auman Haltom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Feinstein
Represented By: James Auman Haltom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara R. Paul
Represented By: James Auman Haltom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T. Breedlove
Represented By: James Auman Haltom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Culotta
Represented By: James Auman Haltom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Hastings
Represented By: James Auman Haltom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quorum Health Corporation
Represented By: James Auman Haltom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Horwitz
Represented By: Erik W. Luedeke
Represented By: Ashley R. Rifkin
Represented By: Steven R. Wedeking
Represented By: Jerry E. Martin
Represented By: Craig W. Smith
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: Christopher M. Wood
Represented By: Benny C. Goodman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?