Taylor-Sterling v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Tina Taylor-Sterling
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2018cv00886
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Fred E. Bourn, III and Ashley J. Markham. (mg)
October 31, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley J. Markham on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Markham, Ashley)
October 31, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Fred E. Bourn, III on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Bourn, Fred)
October 29, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for David L. Johnson. (mg)
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Johnson, David)
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Johnson & Johnson.(Johnson, David)
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ethicon, Inc..(Johnson, David)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Tina Taylor-Sterling. Ethicon, Inc. served on 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment USPS Documentation)(Clanton, Daniel)
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Tina Taylor-Sterling. Johnson & Johnson served on 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment USPS Documentation)(Clanton, Daniel)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/21/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/26/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
September 19, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Daniel W. Clanton: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 10/10/2018. (mg)
September 19, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jimmy W. Bilbo, and Daniel W. Clanton. (mg)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons issued as to Ethicon, Inc., and Johnson & Johnson. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2755741), filed by Tina Taylor-Sterling. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor-Sterling v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Fred E. Bourn, III
Represented By: David L. Johnson
Represented By: Ashley J. Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Fred E. Bourn, III
Represented By: David L. Johnson
Represented By: Ashley J. Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Taylor-Sterling
Represented By: Jimmy W. Bilbo
Represented By: Daniel W. Clanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?