United States of America v. Contents of Five Bank Accounts et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One Great West Life & Annuities Account, Contents of Five Bank Accounts and One CUSO Financial Services Account
Claimant: Samson K. Orusa
Case Number: 3:2018cv00889
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2018 15 Verified ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Samson K. Orusa.(Todd, James)
November 14, 2018 14 COMPLAINT and WARRANT Returned on 9/27/2018 as to Contents of Citizens Bank account number 1595965. (gb)
November 14, 2018 13 COMPLAINT and WARRANT Returned on 9/27/2018 as to Contents of Wells Fargo Bank account number 8255678727. (gb)
November 14, 2018 12 COMPLAINT and WARRANT Returned on 9/27/2018 as to Contents of Fifth Third Bank account number 7902647317. (gb)
November 14, 2018 11 COMPLAINT and WARRANT Returned on 9/27/2018 as to Contents of Branch Banking & Trust account number 5188292471. (gb)
November 14, 2018 10 COMPLAINT and WARRANT Returned on 9/27/2018 as to Contents of Branch Banking & Trust business account number 5185394834. (gb)
November 8, 2018 9 COMPLAINT and WARRANT Returned on 11/1/2018 as to Great West Life & Annuities. (am)
November 8, 2018 8 COMPLAINT and WARRANT Returned on 11/1/2018 as to Contents of CUSO Financial Services, LP. (am)
October 30, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/30/18. (gb)
October 29, 2018 NOTE TO FILER re: DE #5 & #6 . These documents have been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word of WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile these documents, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (gb)
October 29, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for James H. Todd and Katie Hagan. (gb)
October 25, 2018 6 Sealed Document filed by Samson K. Orusa. (Todd, James)
October 25, 2018 5 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Samson K. Orusa. (Todd, James)
October 5, 2018 4 ANSWER to Seizure Warrant by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (gb)
September 20, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Debra Teufel Phillips. (gb)
September 20, 2018 3 Summons and Warrant for Arrest in Rem on Defendant Property, issued by the Clerk. (gb)
September 19, 2018 2 APPLICATION for Summons and Warrant of Arrest in rem by the United States of America. (gb)
September 19, 2018 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT in Rem against Contents of Five Bank Accounts, One CUSO Financial Services Account, One Great West Life & Annuities Account, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit in Support of Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit - Flow Chart, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Contents of Five Bank Accounts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Great West Life & Annuities Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contents of Five Bank Accounts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One CUSO Financial Services Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Debra Teufel Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Samson K. Orusa
Represented By: James H. Todd
Represented By: Katie Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?