Woodside et al v. Gotee Records, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jason Michael Woodside and Jason Woodside Studios, Inc.
Defendant: Holly Marie Miller, Gotee Records, Inc., Gotee Music, Inc. and Wander Creative Productions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00909
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
1 Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
2 Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Gotee Music, Inc., Gotee Records, Inc., Holly Marie Miller, Wander Creative Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Agreed Order)(Kirkpatrick, Philip)
November 20, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Philip Michael Kirkpatrick. (gb)
November 14, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Michael Kirkpatrick on behalf of All Defendants (Kirkpatrick, Philip)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Pursuant to the division of the docket, this case is transferred to Judge Eli J. Richardson. All previously imposed deadlines and Court dates remain unchanged, pending any further order from Judge Richardson. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/22/18. (gb)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/1/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Austin Jones, Registered Agent for Wander Creative Productions, LLC on 09/27/2018, filed by Jason Woodside Studios, Inc., Jason Michael Woodside. (Arters, Joshua)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Joseph Elwood, Registered Agent for Gotee Music, Inc. on 09/26/2018, filed by Jason Woodside Studios, Inc., Jason Michael Woodside. (Arters, Joshua)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Joseph Elwood, Registered Agent for Gotee Records, Inc. on 09/26/2018, filed by Jason Woodside Studios, Inc., Jason Michael Woodside. (Arters, Joshua)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Gotee Music, Inc., Gotee Records, Inc., Holly Marie Miller and Wander Creative Productions, LLC. (gb)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jason Woodside Studios, Inc. (Arters, Joshua)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/26/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (gb)
September 24, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Benjamin M. Rose and Joshua Douglas Arters. (gb)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gotee Music, Inc., Gotee Records, Inc., Holly Marie Miller and Wander Creative Productions, LLC (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-2759849), filed by Jason Michael Woodside, Jason Woodside Studios, Inc. Service copies not provided. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodside et al v. Gotee Records, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Michael Woodside
Represented By: Joshua Douglas Arters
Represented By: Benjamin M. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Woodside Studios, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Douglas Arters
Represented By: Benjamin M. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Marie Miller
Represented By: Philip Michael Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gotee Records, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Michael Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gotee Music, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Michael Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wander Creative Productions, LLC
Represented By: Philip Michael Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?