United States of America et al v. An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 0.21 Acre of Land, More or Less, in Montgomery County, Tennessee et al

Plaintiff: Tennessee Valley Authority and United States of America
Defendant: Betty D. Maynard, James H. Maynard and An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 0.21 Acre of Land, More or Less, in Montgomery County, Tennessee
Case Number: 3:2018cv00968
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 16:0831
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for James W. Fisher, Jr. (jw)
November 7, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Fisher, Jr on behalf of Betty D. Maynard, James H. Maynard (Fisher, James)
October 23, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America re #12 Certificate of Service, #11 Certificate of Service Notice of Completion of Service of Pleadings upon all Defendants as of October 23, 2018 (Chase, James)
October 23, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America Acceptance of Service by Mail - Betty D. Maynard (Chase, James)
October 23, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America Acceptance of Service by Mail - James H. Maynard (Chase, James)
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of #9 MOTION Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession filed by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order of Possession)(Chase, James)
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America. (Chase, James)
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America, Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Property Description, #2 Attachment Amended Declaration of Taking, #3 Attachment Property Description, #4 Attachment Map)(Chase, James)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 Investment Deposit Received in the amount of $3,125.00. Receipt Number 34675052094. (sw)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Tendering Deposit (Chase, James)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING DEPOSIT OF FUNDS: It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court shall accept a check for $3,125 to be deposited pursuant to the Declaration of Taking filed in this action, and any future funds to be deposited in this action, in accordance with Local Rule 67.01 of this Court. IT IS ORDERED that counsel presenting this order serve a copy thereof on the Clerk of this Court or his Chief Deputy. Absent the aforesaid service, the Clerk is hereby relieved of personal liability relative to compliance with this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all funds received shall be deposited in the Court Registry Investment System (CRIS) administered by the Administrative Office of the United States Courts pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2045. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/1/2018. (Copy to financial and VK via ecf.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
September 27, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for James S. Chase. (jw)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Property Description)(jw)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Taking filed by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Map, #2 Property Description, #3 Proposed Order Directing Deposit of Funds)(jw)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 0.21 Acre of Land, More or Less, in Montgomery County, Tennessee, Betty D. Maynard, James H. Maynard, filed by United States of America, Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Property Description)(jw) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/4/2018) (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 0.21 Acre of Land, More or Less, in Montgomery County, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty D. Maynard
Represented By: James W. Fisher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H. Maynard
Represented By: James W. Fisher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 0.21 Acre of Land, More or Less, in Montgomery County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?