United State of America et al v. An Easement and Right-Of-Way Over 0.38 Acre of Land, More Or Less, in Montgomery County, Tennessee et al

Plaintiff: United State of America and Tennessee Valley Authority
Defendant: An Easement and Right-Of-Way Over 0.38 Acre of Land, More Or Less, in Montgomery County, Tennessee, Peter M. Olson and Additional Rights with Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right-Of-Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee
Case Number: 3:2018cv00969
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 16:0831
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of #9 Amended Complaint, #6 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession, #10 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 Amended Complaint, #6 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession filed by Tennessee Valley Authority, United State of America Memorandum in Support of Amended Motion for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order of Possession)(Chase, James)
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 Amended Complaint, #6 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by Tennessee Valley Authority, United State of America. (Chase, James)
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United State of America, Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Property Description, #2 Attachment Amended Declaration of Taking, #3 Attachment Property Description, #4 Attachment Map)(Chase, James)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 Investment Deposit Received in the amount of $3,850.00. Receipt Number 34675052095. (sw)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession filed by United State of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order of Possession)(Chase, James)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by United State of America. (Chase, James)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by United State of America Notice of Tendering Deposit (Chase, James)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Clerk of this Court shall accept a check for $3,850 to be deposited pursuant to the Declaration of Taking filed in this action, and any future funds to be deposited in this action. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/1/18. (xc: Finance and Clerk of Court) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
September 27, 2018 State Bar status verified as active for James S. Chase. (gb)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Condemnation by Tennessee Valley Authority, United State of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Property Description)(gb)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Taking filed by Tennessee Valley Authority, United State of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Property Description, #2 Attachment Drawing, #3 Attachment Proposed Order Directing Deposit of Funds)(gb)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against An Easement and Right-Of-Way Over 0.38 Acre of Land, More Or Less, in Montgomery County, Tennessee and Peter M. Olson, filed by the United State of America, Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Property Description, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United State of America et al v. An Easement and Right-Of-Way Over 0.38 Acre of Land, More Or Less, in Montgomery County, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: An Easement and Right-Of-Way Over 0.38 Acre of Land, More Or Less, in Montgomery County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter M. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Additional Rights with Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right-Of-Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United State of America
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?