St. Clair County Employees' Retirement System v. Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: St. Clair County Employees' Retirement System
Defendant: David Duckworth, Joey A. Jacobs, Brent Turner and Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00988
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
0 Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
1 Judge: Alistair Newbern
2 Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2018 22 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/5/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
November 5, 2018 21 Featured Case ORDER granting #16 Motion for Jessica P. Corley, Lisa R. Bugni and Derek S. Hammond to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/5/2018. (jw)
November 5, 2018 GA State Bar status verified as active for Jessica Perry Corley, Lisa R. Bugni; DC Bar status verified as active for Derek S. Hammond. (jw)
November 5, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Milton S. McGee, III, Steven Allen Riley. (jw)
November 1, 2018 20 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., David Duckworth, Joey A. Jacobs, Brent Turner. (Riley, Steven)
October 31, 2018 19 DECLARATION of Derek S. Hammond filed by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., David Duckworth, Joey A. Jacobs, Brent Turner re: #16 MOTION for attorney(s) Jessica P. Corley, Lisa R. Bugni, and Derek S. Hammond to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2788485). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
October 31, 2018 18 DECLARATION of Lisa R. Bugni filed by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., David Duckworth, Joey A. Jacobs, Brent Turner re: #16 MOTION for attorney(s) Jessica P. Corley, Lisa R. Bugni, and Derek S. Hammond to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2788485). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
October 31, 2018 17 DECLARATION of Jessica P. Corley filed by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., David Duckworth, Joey A. Jacobs, Brent Turner re: #16 MOTION for attorney(s) Jessica P. Corley, Lisa R. Bugni, and Derek S. Hammond to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2788485). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
October 31, 2018 16 MOTION for attorney(s) Jessica P. Corley, Lisa R. Bugni, and Derek S. Hammond to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2788485) by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., David Duckworth, Joey A. Jacobs, Brent Turner. (Riley, Steven)
October 31, 2018 15 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., David Duckworth, Joey A. Jacobs, Brent Turner. (Riley, Steven)
October 31, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Allen Riley on behalf of All Defendants (Riley, Steven)
October 31, 2018 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Milton S. McGee, III on behalf of All Defendants (McGee, Milton)
October 26, 2018 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by St. Clair County Employees' Retirement System. Joey A. Jacobs waiver sent on 10/12/2018. (Wood, Christopher)
October 26, 2018 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by St. Clair County Employees' Retirement System. David Duckworth waiver sent on 10/12/2018. (Wood, Christopher)
October 26, 2018 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by St. Clair County Employees' Retirement System. Brent Turner waiver sent on 10/12/2018. (Wood, Christopher)
October 26, 2018 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by St. Clair County Employees' Retirement System. Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2018. (Wood, Christopher)
October 26, 2018 CA State Bar status verified as active for Danielle S. Myers. (jw)
October 22, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Eli J. Richardson for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/22/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
October 16, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER granting #6 Motion for Danielle S. Myers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/16/2018. (jw)
October 15, 2018 6 MOTION for attorney(s) Danielle S. Myers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2774591) by St. Clair County Employees' Retirement System. (Wood, Christopher)
October 4, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/4/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
October 2, 2018 4 Summons issued as to Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., David Duckworth, Joey A. Jacobs, Brent Turner and mailed to Christopher M. Wood for service. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Jacobs Issued Summons, #2 Attachment Turner Issued Summons, #3 Attachment Duckworth Issued Summons)(af)
October 1, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher M. Wood & Jerry E. Martin; CA State Bar status verified as active for David C. Walton & Danielle S. Myers; MI State Bar status verified as active for Thomas C. Michaud. (af)
October 1, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL David C. Walton, Danielle S. Myers, Thomas C. Michaud: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/22/2018. (af)
October 1, 2018 3 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (af)
October 1, 2018 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by St. Clair County Employees' Retirement System. (af)
October 1, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by St. Clair County Employees' Retirement System (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2765532) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Clair County Employees' Retirement System v. Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Clair County Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Jerry E. Martin
Represented By: Christopher M. Wood
Represented By: Thomas C. Michaud
Represented By: Danielle S. Myers
Represented By: David C. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Duckworth
Represented By: Derek S. Hammond
Represented By: Jessica Perry Corley
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Represented By: Lisa R. Bugni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey A. Jacobs
Represented By: Derek S. Hammond
Represented By: Jessica Perry Corley
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Represented By: Lisa R. Bugni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Turner
Represented By: Derek S. Hammond
Represented By: Jessica Perry Corley
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Represented By: Lisa R. Bugni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc.
Represented By: Derek S. Hammond
Represented By: Jessica Perry Corley
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Represented By: Lisa R. Bugni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?