Scepter, Inc. v. Nolan Transportation Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Scepter, Inc.
Defendant: Nolan Transportation Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00990
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, Nolan Transportation Group, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Under F. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) or Alternatively to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Doc. No. #7 ) is DENIED. This case is hereby returned to Magistrate Judge Newbern for further pretrial case management. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/29/2018. (jm)
November 29, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/29/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss under FRCP 12(b)(6) or Alternatively to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Nolan Transportation Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to NTG's Reply Brief)(Pope, Britney)
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Scepter, Inc.. (Fardon, D.)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: On October 8, 2018, Defendant filed a motion to dismiss, or alternatively, transfer venue. (Doc. No. #7 .) Pursuant to Local Rule 7.01(a) (3), any response is to be filed within 14 days after service of the motion. M.D. Tenn. R. 7.01(a)(3) (response). A reply memorandum not to exceed five pages may be filed within 7 days after service of the response. Id. 7.01(a) (4) (reply). Any filings made related to the motion to dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Judge Crenshaw unless referred to the undersigned magistrate judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/9/2018. (jm)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Scepter, Inc.. (Fardon, D.)
October 8, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nolan Transportation Group, LLC . (Patton, Claude)
October 8, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Nolan Transportation Group, LLC. (Patton, Claude)
October 8, 2018 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nolan Transportation Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment to Business Entity Disclosure)(Pope, Britney)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/5/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jm)
October 3, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Claude Benton Patton, Britney Kennedy Pope, and D. Alexander Fardon. (jm)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nolan Transportation Group, LLC from Chancery Court of Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 18-942-I. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0650-2766163) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint and Summons)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scepter, Inc. v. Nolan Transportation Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scepter, Inc.
Represented By: D. Alexander Fardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nolan Transportation Group, LLC
Represented By: Britney Kennedy Pope
Represented By: Claude Benton Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?