Reasonover v. Apple Computer Inc.
Plaintiff: Stacey Reasonover and Stacie Reasonover
Defendant: Apple Computer Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00993
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 15 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Chapski, Robert) Modified Text on 11/29/2018 (am).
November 28, 2018 Filing 14 JOINT PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Apple Computer Inc. (Chapski, Robert) Modified Text on 11/29/2018 (am).
November 20, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for William Lipsey. (am)
November 19, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by William Lipsey on behalf of Stacie Reasonover (Lipsey, William)
November 7, 2018 Notice to Filer re DE 12 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Counsel shall re-file the document. (am)
November 7, 2018 DISREGARD DE: 12 , WRONG EVENT TYPE. (am)
November 6, 2018 Filing 12 **DISREGARD WRONG EVENT TYPE**CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stacie Reasonover 11/06/2018 (Easterly, Bill) Modified on 11/7/2018 (am).
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed 11/06/2018 Acknowledgement filed by Stacie Reasonover. (Easterly, Bill)
November 6, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert F. Chapski, Ryan N. Clark. (am)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Apple Computer Inc..(Clark, Ryan)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Computer Inc.. (Clark, Ryan)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan N. Clark on behalf of Apple Computer Inc. (Clark, Ryan)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Chapski on behalf of Apple Computer Inc. (Chapski, Robert)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/5/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (am).
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Apple Computer Inc. (Service packets sent to Attorney by regular mail.) (am)
October 4, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Bill W. Easterly. (am)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Computer Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2767558), filed by Stacie Reasonover. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am) Modified Text on 10/12/2018 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reasonover v. Apple Computer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Reasonover
Represented By: Bill W. Easterly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacie Reasonover
Represented By: Bill W. Easterly
Represented By: William Lipsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Computer Inc.
Represented By: Ryan N. Clark
Represented By: Robert F. Chapski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?