W. et al v. Williamson County Schools
Plaintiff: E. W., B. W. and R. W.
Defendant: Williamson County Schools
Case Number: 3:2018cv00995
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
2 Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:12131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Lisa M. Carson. (dt)
November 16, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Williamson County Schools.(Carson, Lisa)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #1 Complaint. Williamson County Schools answer due 11/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/6/18. (dt)
November 6, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Lisa M. Carson. (dt)
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Williamson County Schools. (Carson, Lisa)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Williamson County Schools. (Carson, Lisa)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M. Carson on behalf of Williamson County Schools (Carson, Lisa)
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by E. W., B. W., R. W. Williamson County Schools served on 10/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-- Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Returned Receipt)(Gilbert, Justin) Modified on 10/26/2018 (dt).
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 138, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to Judge Eli Richardson for all purposes. All present deadlines and court dates shall remain in place, subject to modification by Judge Richardson or the magistrate judge. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/24/18. (dt)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica F. Salonus on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Salonus, Jessica)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(d)(5). Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/11/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Williamson County Schools. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
October 4, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Justin S. Gilbert and Jessica F. Salonus. (dt)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Williamson County Schools (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2767620), filed by E. W., B. W. and R. W. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W. et al v. Williamson County Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. W.
Represented By: Justin S. Gilbert
Represented By: Jessica F. Salonus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. W.
Represented By: Justin S. Gilbert
Represented By: Jessica F. Salonus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. W.
Represented By: Justin S. Gilbert
Represented By: Jessica F. Salonus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williamson County Schools
Represented By: Lisa M. Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?