Gutierrez v. Sandoval

Petitioner: Gabriel Alfaro Gutierrez
Respondent: Brenda Janeth Quintino Sandoval
Case Number: 3:2018cv01036
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
0 Judge: William L Campbell
1 Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER: The Initial Case Management Conference previously scheduled for December 10, 2018, at 11:30 a.m., is hereby RESET for January 14, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 783. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 12/7/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
December 6, 2018 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Gabriel Alfaro Gutierrez. Amendment to #6 Proposed Case Management Order . (McKelvey, Rebecca)
December 5, 2018 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Gabriel Alfaro Gutierrez. Brenda Janeth Quintino Sandoval served on 12/3/2018. (McKelvey, Rebecca)
December 5, 2018 6 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Gabriel Alfaro Gutierrez. (McKelvey, Rebecca)
October 11, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(d)(5). Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/11/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
October 11, 2018 4 Summons issued as to Brenda Janeth Quintino Sandoval. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (mg)
October 10, 2018 3 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg)
October 10, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Rebecca K. McKelvey, Brenton H. Lankford, and Ashley Goins. (mg)
October 10, 2018 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
October 10, 2018 1 PETITION FOR RETURN OF MINOR CHILD TO PETITIONER against Brenda Janeth Quintino Sandoval (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2771080), filed by Gabriel Alfaro Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - The Convention, #2 Exhibit B - ICARA, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Code for the State of Nuevo Leon, #4 Exhibit D - Divorce Decree, #5 Exhibit E - Custody Order, #6 Exhibit F - Child's Birth Certificate, #7 Exhibit G - Child's Unique Identify Code, #8 Exhibit H - Letter from School, #9 Exhibit I - Child's School Records, #10 Exhibit J - Translated Request for Return, #11 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gabriel Alfaro Gutierrez
Represented By: Brenton H. Lankford
Represented By: Rebecca K. McKelvey
Represented By: Ashley Goins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brenda Janeth Quintino Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?