United States of America et al v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Plaintiff: Sterling Boiler & Mechanical, LLC and United States of America
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Case Number: 3:2018cv01038
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
2 Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Accordingly, this case is STAYED. The Clerk is directed to close this case administratively, pending further Order of the Court. The pending Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 15) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/20/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
November 19, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA of Parties' Agreement for Stay Pending Arbitration and Request for Entry of Agreed Order (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Agreed Order)(Lee, Melissa)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: On November 8, 2018, Defendant filed a motion to dismiss and memorandum in support (Docket Entry Nos. 15, 16). Any response by Plaintiff shall be filed pursuant to Rule 12, Fed. R. Civ. P., and Local Rue 7.01(a)(3). An optional reply may be filed within seven (7) days of the filing of the response, and shall not exceed five (5) pages. The initial case management conference remains scheduled for 10:00 a.m., December 10, 2018, whether or not a ruling has entered on this pending motion, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/13/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
November 9, 2018 Filing 18 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Lee, Melissa)
November 9, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA re Docket Annotation,. (Lee, Melissa)
November 9, 2018 Notice to Filer re DE #15 & #16 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, all filings shall include a Certificate of Service and it shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel SHALL FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document using the Certificate event located under Other Documents. (jw)
November 8, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Melissa J. Lee and John Michael Gillum. (jw)
November 8, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA . (Lee, Melissa)
November 8, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Lee, Melissa)
November 7, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Gillum on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (Gillum, John)
November 7, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa J. Lee on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (Lee, Melissa)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Eli J. Richardson for all further proceedings. District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/24/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed as to #10 Summons Returned Executed Acknowledgement filed by Sterling Boiler & Mechanical, LLC. (Berry, Douglas)
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Sterling Boiler & Mechanical, LLC. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA served on 10/18/2018. (Berry, Douglas)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sterling Boiler & Mechanical, LLC. (Berry, Douglas)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/12/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (jw)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 Summons issued as to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw)
October 11, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Douglas Berry; DC Bar status verified as active for Paul W. Killian; VA State Bar status verified as active for Shelly L. Ewald and George Stewart. (jw)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney(s) Paul Killian, Shelly L. Ewald, George E. Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2771938) by Sterling Boiler & Mechanical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing - Killian, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing - Ewald, #3 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing - Stewart, #4 Attachment Proposed Order)(Berry, Douglas)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sterling Boiler & Mechanical, LLC, United States of America. (jw)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2771192), filed by United States of America, Sterling Boiler & Mechanical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Prime Contract, #3 Exhibit B - Subcontract, #4 Exhibit C - Payment Bond, #5 Exhibit D - Notice, #6 Exhibit E - Notice, #7 Exhibit F - Notice of Claim)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling Boiler & Mechanical, LLC
Represented By: Shelly L. Ewald
Represented By: Douglas Berry
Represented By: George Stewart
Represented By: Paul W. Killian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Melissa J. Lee
Represented By: John Michael Gillum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?