Johnson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Amos Johnson
Defendant: Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, Nancy Berryhill and U.S. Attorney's Office
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2018cv01106
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Company Representative on 11/15/2018 by Amos Johnson. (Klinghard, Katie)
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Company Representative on 11/13/2018 by Amos Johnson. (Klinghard, Katie)
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Company Representative on 11/05/2018 by Amos Johnson. (Klinghard, Katie)
December 11, 2018 Notice to Filer re DE 6 , 7 , 8 , 9 , 10 , 11 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Service of Process/Summons Returned Executed as to USA. Counsel shall re-file the document. (mg) Modified text on 12/11/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 ***DISREGARD*** GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed as to 10 Affidavit of Service Acknowledgement filed by Amos Johnson. (Klinghard, Katie) Modified text on 12/11/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 ***DISREGARD*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice on 11/15/2018, filed by Amos Johnson. (Klinghard, Katie) Modified text on 12/11/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 ***DISREGARD*** GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed as to 8 Affidavit of Service Acknowledgement filed by Amos Johnson. (Klinghard, Katie) Modified text on 12/11/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 *** DISREGARD*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Nancy Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security on 11/13/2018, filed by Amos Johnson. (Klinghard, Katie) Modified text on 12/11/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 ***DISREGARD***GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed as to 6 Affidavit of Service Acknowledgement filed by Amos Johnson. (Klinghard, Katie) Modified text on 12/11/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 ***DISREGARD***AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on U.S. Attorney on 11/05/2018, filed by Amos Johnson. (Klinghard, Katie) Modified text on 12/11/2018 (mg).
November 5, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon. (mg)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon on behalf of Social Security Administration (Maynor-Faulcon, Mercedes)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/16/2018. (mg)
October 16, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Katie B. Klinghard. (mg)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg).
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2774437), filed by Amos Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/15/2018) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amos Johnson
Represented By: Katie B. Klinghard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?