United States of America v. Additional Rights With Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right of Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: United States of America and Tennessee Valley Authority
Defendant: Courtney Maynard Caudill, Additional Rights With Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right of Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee and Nicklas R. Caudill
Case Number: 3:2018cv01123
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 16:0831
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America re #11 Certificate of Service, #10 Certificate of Service Notice of Completion of Service of Pleadings Upon All Defendants as of December 7, 2018 (Chase, James)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 Acceptance of Service by Mail - Nicklas R. Caudill by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America (Chase, James) Modified Text on 12/11/2018 (am).
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 Acceptance of Service by Mail - Courtney Maynard Caudill by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America (Chase, James) Modified Text on 12/11/2018 (am).
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 Investment Deposit Received in the amount of $500.00. Receipt Number 34675052400. (sw)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of #7 MOTION Motion for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession filed by United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order of Possession)(Chase, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION Motion for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by United States of America. (Chase, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Tendering Deposit (Chase, James)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING THE DEPOSIT OF FUNDS: It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court shall accept a check for $500 to be deposited pursuant to the Declaration of Taking filed in this action, and any future funds to be deposited in this action, in accordance with Local Rule 67.01 of this Court. IT IS ORDERED that counsel presenting this order serve a copy thereof on the Clerk of this Court or his Chief Deputy. Absent the aforesaid service, the Clerk is hereby relieved of personal liability relative to compliance with this order. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/19/2018. (xc: Vicki Kinkade and financial via ecf.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
October 18, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for James S. Chase. (am)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Condemnation by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Property Description)(am)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Taking filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Map, #2 Attachment - Property Description, #3 Attachment - Proposed Order Directing Deposit of Funds)(am)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Additional Rights With Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right of Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee, Courtney Maynard Caudill, Nicklas R. Caudill, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment - Property Description(am) Modified Text on 10/18/2018 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Additional Rights With Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right of Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Maynard Caudill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Additional Rights With Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right of Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicklas R. Caudill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?