United States of America et al v. Additional Rights with Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right-Of-Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee et al

Plaintiff: Tennessee Valley Authority and United States of America
Defendant: Altra Federal Credit Union, Additional Rights with Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right-Of-Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee, Lorraine E. Neary, Lorraine M. Neary and Jim Edwards
Case Number: 3:2018cv01145
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 16:0831
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America re #14 Green Card Returned, #11 Certificate of Service, #12 Certificate of Service, #13 Green Card Returned of Completion of Service of Pleadings upon all Defendants as of December 7, 2018 (Chase, James)
December 11, 2018 Filing 14 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed Jim Edwards Acknowledgement filed by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America. (Chase, James)
December 11, 2018 Filing 13 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed Altra Federal Credit Union Acknowledgement filed by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America. (Chase, James)
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America Lorraine E. Neary (Chase, James)
December 11, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America Lorraine M. Neary (Chase, James)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF POSSESSION: TVA shall have and be put into immediate possession of the real property specifically described in Plaintiff's Declaration of Taking to the extent necessary to allow, enable, and permit TVA to carry on and perform any of its operations described in the pleadings. Defendants are ORDERED to immediately comply with this Order and to surrender possession of said real property to TVA pending further order of the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/27/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 Investment Deposit Received in the amount of $1,825.00. Receipt Number 34675052690. (sw)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of #7 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession filed by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Chase, James)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America. (Chase, James)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America Notice of Tendering Deposit (Chase, James)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING DEPOSIT OF FUNDS: It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court shall accept a check for $1,825 to be deposited pursuant to the Declaration of Taking filed in this action, and any future funds to be deposited in this action, in accordance with Local Rule 67.01 of this Court. All funds received shall be deposited in the Court Registry Investment System (CRIS) administered by the Administrative Office of the United States Courts pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2045. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/16/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
October 23, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for James S. Chase. (dt)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION by Tennessee Valley Authority and United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Property Description)(dt)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Taking filed by Tennessee Valley Authority and United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Property Description, #2 Attachment - Map, #3 Attachment - Proposed Order Directing Deposit of Funds)(dt)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Additional Rights with Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right-Of-Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee, Altra Federal Credit Union, Jim Edwards, Lorraine M. Neary, Lorraine E. Neary, filed by United States of America and Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Property Description, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Additional Rights with Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right-Of-Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altra Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Additional Rights with Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right-Of-Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorraine E. Neary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorraine M. Neary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?