Environmental Compliance Partners, Inc. v. YRC Worldwide, Inc.
Plaintiff: Environmental Compliance Partners, Inc.
Defendant: YRC Worldwide, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01200
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (jm)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Continue the initial case management conference. It shall be held on January 15, 2019 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/16/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by YRC Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Ziegenhorn, Jennifer)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Environmental Compliance Partners, Inc.. (Warth, Andrew)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/26/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by YRC Worldwide, Inc.. (Ziegenhorn, Jennifer)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/27/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (jm)
October 25, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Andrew A. Warth and Jennifer G. Ziegenhorn. (jm)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by YRC Worldwide, Inc. from Chancery Court of Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 18-1063-I. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2782702) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Civil Court Filing Records, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Attachment Answer and Defenses)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Environmental Compliance Partners, Inc. v. YRC Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Compliance Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew A. Warth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer G. Ziegenhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?