Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Priority Pest Protection, LLC
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Priority Pest Protection, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01217
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss (JBB)
December 28, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed order submitted)(Stewart, Jonathan)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to forward the motions to Judge Richardson for his consideration. The Initial Case Management Conference remains set for 1:00 p.m. on January 7, 2019, whether or not a ruling has entered on the pending motions to dismiss, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 12/27/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Priority Pest Protection, LLC.(McWherter, J.)
December 21, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Priority Pest Protection, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Aspen Specialty Ins. Co. v. Southeastern Title of Murfreesboro, LLC, #2 Attachment State Farm v. Beck's Branch, Inc., et al)(McWherter, J.)
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Priority Pest Protection, LLC. (McWherter, J.)
November 15, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SETTING OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2019 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (mg)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. All existing case management dates, deadlines, and trial settings remain in effect, pending further order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/14/2018. (mg)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 138, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to Judge Eli Richardson for all purposes. All present deadlines and court dates shall remain in place, subject to modification by Judge Richardson or the magistrate judge. The initial case management conference scheduled for January 7, 2019 before Judge Trauger is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/13/2018. (mg) Modified text on 11/14/2018 (mg).
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AGREED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Priority Pest Protection, LLC, shall have up to and including DECEMBER 24, 2018, to file its Answer or otherwise plead in response to the Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/13/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Priority Pest Protection, LLC answer due 12/24/2018. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/13/2018. (mg)
November 13, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Brandon McWherter and William D. Buckley, III. (mg)
November 12, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Priority Pest Protection, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Buckley, William)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by William D. Buckley, III on behalf of Priority Pest Protection, LLC (Buckley, William)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Brandon McWherter on behalf of Priority Pest Protection, LLC (McWherter, J.)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Priority Pest Protection, LLC served on 11/2/2018. (Stewart, Jonathan)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Stewart, Jonathan)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2019 at 1:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Priority Pest Protection, LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
October 31, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jonathan David Stewart. (mg)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Priority Pest Protection, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2787140), filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - Complint and Summons lower court)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Priority Pest Protection, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Pest Protection, LLC
Represented By: J. Brandon McWherter
Represented By: William D. Buckley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan David Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?