United States of America et al v. Additional Rights With Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right of Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee et al

Plaintiff: Tennessee Valley Authority and United States of America
Defendant: Christopher C. McClure III, Additional Rights With Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right of Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., Rossana A. McClure and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Trustee: J. Phillip Jones
Case Number: 3:2018cv01221
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 16:0831
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Rossana A. McClure, Christopher C. McClure III.(Fisher, James)
December 17, 2018 Notice to Filer re DE #17 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, all filings shall include a Certificate of Service and it shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel SHALL FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document using the Certificate event located under Other Documents. (jm)
December 11, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America re #16 Green Card Returned, #15 Green Card Returned, #12 Certificate of Service, #14 Green Card Returned, #13 Certificate of Service of Completion of Service of Pleadings upon all Defendants as of December 7, 2018 (Chase, James)
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. Acknowledgement filed by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America. (Chase, James)
December 11, 2018 Filing 15 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed J. Phillip Jones Acknowledgement filed by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America. (Chase, James)
December 11, 2018 Filing 14 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed U.S. Bank N. A. Acknowledgement filed by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America. (Chase, James)
December 11, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America Christopher C. McClure, III (Chase, James)
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America Rossana A. McClure (Chase, James)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession. Defendants are ORDERED to immediately comply with this Order and to surrender possession of said real property to TVA pending further order of the Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/27/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
November 15, 2018 Filing 10 Investment Deposit Received in the amount of $3,925.00. Receipt Number 34675052593. (sw)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Fisher, Jr on behalf of Rossana A. McClure, Christopher C. McClure III (Fisher, James)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of #7 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession filed by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order of Possession)(Chase, James)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America. (Chase, James)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America of Tendering Deposit (Chase, James)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court shall accept a check for $3,925 to be deposited pursuant to the Declaration of Taking filed in this action, and any future funds to be deposited in this action, in accordance with Local Rule 67.01 of this Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/5/2018. (jm)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
November 2, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for James W. Fisher, Jr. and James S. Chase. (jm)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION filed by Tennessee Valley Authority and United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Property Description)(jm)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Taking filed by Tennessee Valley Authority and United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Property Description, #2 Attachment Map, #3 Attachment Proposed Order Directing Deposit of Funds)(jm)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Additional Rights With Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right of Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee, J. Phillip Jones, Rossana A. McClure, Christopher C. McClure III, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., and U.S. Bank, N.A., filed by United States of America, Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Attachment Property Description)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Additional Rights With Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right of Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: J. Phillip Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher C. McClure III
Represented By: James W. Fisher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Additional Rights With Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right of Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee
Represented By: James W. Fisher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rossana A. McClure
Represented By: James W. Fisher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?