United States of America et al v. Additional Rights With Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right of Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee et al

Plaintiff: United States of America and Tennessee Valley Authority
Defendant: Additional Rights With Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right of Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee, Mortgage Electronic Recording Systems, Inc., Luke Baine, Andrew C. Rambo, Katie Baine and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01236
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 16:0831
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: By no later than January 14, 2019, Plaintiffs shall file a proposed schedule for the progression of this case, including as to any matters provided for in Fed. R. Civ. P. 71.1, and updating the Court on the status of the case. If necessary, the Court may schedule a subsequent case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/13/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/6/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
November 6, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for James S. Chase. (mg)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Condemnation by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Property Description)(mg)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Taking filed by Tennessee Valley Authority, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Property Description, #2 Attachment - Map, #3 Attachment - Proposed Order Directing Deposit of Funds)(mg)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Additional Rights With Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right of Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee, Katie Baine, Luke Baine, Mortgage Electronic Recording Systems, Inc., Andrew C. Rambo, filed by United States of America, Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2018: #2 Attachment - Property Description) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Additional Rights With Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right of Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Additional Rights With Respect to a Preexisting Easement and Right of Way Over Land in Montgomery County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Recording Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Baine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew C. Rambo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Baine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?