AK et al v. Behavioral Health Systems, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: AK and CK
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama, Inc., American Family Care, Inc. Group Healthcare Plan and Behavioral Health Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01238
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
1 Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by AK. (Skeie, Peter)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. 21) of Paul J. Rinefierd is GRANTED. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade on 12/19/2018. (jw)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. 20) of Mark C. Nielsen is GRANTED. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade on 12/19/2018. (jw)
December 19, 2018 D.C. Bar status verified as active for Mark C. Nielsen and Paul J. Rinefierd. (jw)
December 18, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for attorney(s) Paul J. Rinefierd to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2818259) by Behavioral Health Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing)(Wahlheim, William)
December 18, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for attorney(s) Mark C. Nielsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2818254) by Behavioral Health Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing)(Wahlheim, William)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. American Family Care, Inc. Group Healthcare Plan answer due 1/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/17/2018. (jw)
December 14, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or other responsive pleading by American Family Care, Inc. Group Healthcare Plan. (Parman, Steven)
December 14, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Steven Douglas Parman. (jw)
December 13, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Douglas Parman on behalf of American Family Care, Inc. Group Healthcare Plan (Parman, Steven)
December 6, 2018 Filing 16 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Behavioral Health Systems, Inc.. (Wahlheim, William)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Behavioral Health Systems, Inc. answer due 1/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/4/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Behavioral Health Systems, Inc.. (Wahlheim, William)
December 3, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Timothy A. Palmer. (jw)
November 30, 2018 Filing 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama, Inc.. (Palmer, Timothy)
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - American Family Care 2016 SPD, #2 Exhibit 2 - American Family Care Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - 10459 BlueCard PPO Matrix)(Palmer, Timothy)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/15/2018. (jw)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously as AK and CK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/15/2018. (jw)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/9/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by AK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, Exhibit II, #2 Exhibit Complaint, Exhibit III)(Skeie, Peter)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jw)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 Summons issued as to American Family Care, Inc. Group Healthcare Plan, Behavioral Health Systems, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama, Inc. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw)
November 7, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Peter T. Skeie. (jw)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2 MOTION for Leave to to Proceed Anonymously re #1 Complaint, filed by AK . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement by Beth Lamb, LCSW)(Skeie, Peter)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to to Proceed Anonymously re #1 Complaint, by AK. (Skeie, Peter)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Family Care, Inc. Group Healthcare Plan, Behavioral Health Systems, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2791442), filed by AK, CK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - American Family Care, Inc. Health Plan)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AK et al v. Behavioral Health Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy A. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Care, Inc. Group Healthcare Plan
Represented By: Steven Douglas Parman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Behavioral Health Systems, Inc.
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Represented By: Mark C. Nielsen
Represented By: Paul J. Rinefierd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AK
Represented By: Peter T. Skeie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CK
Represented By: Peter T. Skeie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?