Jean et al v. Auto-Owners (Mutual) Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jason Jean and Annessa Jean
Defendant: Auto-Owners (Mutual) Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01256
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference. The initial case management conference is RESET for 1/28/2019 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/2/19. (gb)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Annessa Jean, Jason Jean. (McWherter, J.)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Auto-Owners (Mutual) Insurance Company. (Ferrell, E.)
November 30, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Parks T. Chastain, and E. Jason Ferrell. (mg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Jason Ferrell on behalf of Auto-Owners (Mutual) Insurance Company (Ferrell, E.)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Parks T. Chastain on behalf of Auto-Owners (Mutual) Insurance Company (Chastain, Parks)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jason Jean, Annessa Jean. Auto-Owners (Mutual) Insurance Company waiver sent on 11/19/2018. (McWherter, J.)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2019 at 2:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Auto-Owners (Mutual) Insurance Company. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
November 6, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Brandon McWherter. (mg)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Auto-Owners (Mutual) Insurance Company (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2792294), filed by Jason Jean, Annessa Jean. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jean et al v. Auto-Owners (Mutual) Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Jean
Represented By: J. Brandon McWherter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annessa Jean
Represented By: J. Brandon McWherter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners (Mutual) Insurance Company
Represented By: E. Jason Ferrell
Represented By: Parks T. Chastain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?