Wiesmuller v. Oliver et al

Plaintiff: Christopher L. Wiesmuller
Defendant: Charlene Oliver, Cary Oliver and Corrine N. Wiesmuller
Case Number: 3:2018cv01257
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Alistair Newbern
1 Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 30 Proposed Findings of Fact RESPONSE by Cary Oliver, Charlene Oliver, Corrine N. Wiesmuller. (Wiggington, James)
January 3, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 Response in Opposition to Motion by Cary Oliver, Charlene Oliver, Corrine N. Wiesmuller. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Wiggington, James)
January 3, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct #18 Memorandum in Support, #17 MOTION to Dismiss, #16 Memorandum in Support, #14 Memorandum in Support, #13 MOTION to Dismiss, #15 MOTION to Dismiss by Cary Oliver, Charlene Oliver, Corrine N. Wiesmuller. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Wiggington, James)
January 3, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Cary Oliver, Charlene Oliver, Corrine N. Wiesmuller. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit of Corrine Oliver, #2 Attachment E-mail from Plaintiff To Defendant Corrine Wiesmueller)(Wiggington, James)
January 3, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Wiggington on behalf of All Defendants (Wiggington, James)
December 21, 2018 Filing 25 Sealed Attachment #1 Affidavit filed by Christopher L. Wiesmuller. (am)
December 20, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing Audio Recording and Certificate of Service by Christopher L. Wiesmuller (am)
December 20, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Seal and Redact Affidavit of Christopher L. Wiesmueller in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Christopher L. Wiesmuller. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Motion for Summary Judgment Attachment #1 Affidavit of Christopher L. Wisemueller)(am)
December 20, 2018 Filing 22 Proposed Findings of Fact by Christopher L. Wiesmuller (am)
December 20, 2018 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of #20 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Christopher L. Wiesmuller. (am)
December 20, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Christopher L. Wiesmuller. (am)
December 12, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss re #13 , #15 , #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Christopher L. Wiesmuller. (mg)
November 29, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Charlene Oliver. (mg)
November 29, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Charlene Oliver. (mg)
November 29, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cary Oliver. (mg)
November 29, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Cary Oliver. (mg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Corrine N. Wiesmuller. (mg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Corrine N. Wiesmuller. (mg)
November 19, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Christopher L. Wiesmuller. Charlene Oliver served on 11/9/2018. (mg)
November 19, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Christopher L. Wiesmuller. Cary Oliver served on 11/9/2018. (mg)
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Christopher L. Wiesmuller. Corrine N. Wiesmuller served on 11/9/2018. (mg)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. The Magistrate Judge is asked to issue a report and recommendation on dispositive motions. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/8/2018. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (mg)
November 7, 2018 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form along with Notice, Consent form included.) (mg)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Appointment of Expert Witness by Christopher L. Wiesmuller. (mg)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Permission to E-File by Christopher L. Wiesmuller. (mg)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Cary Oliver, Charlene Oliver and Corrine N. Wiesmuller. Service copies given to pro se plaintiff, Wiesmuller. (mg)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 SEALED Complaint filed by Christopher L. Wiesmuller. (mg)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Redact and Seal Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet by Christopher L. Wiesmuller. (mg)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (redacted) against Cary Oliver, Charlene Oliver, Corrine N. Wiesmuller (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 34675052539), filed by Christopher L. Wiesmuller. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment - Filing Fee Receipt)(mg) Modified text on 11/7/2018 (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiesmuller v. Oliver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Wiesmuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene Oliver
Represented By: James R. Wiggington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cary Oliver
Represented By: James R. Wiggington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrine N. Wiesmuller
Represented By: James R. Wiggington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?