Tennessee Valley Painters Health Fund v. Thomas Industrial Coatings, Incorporated

Plaintiff: Tennessee Valley Painters Health Fund
Defendant: Thomas Industrial Coatings, Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2018cv01303
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Thomas Industrial Coatings, Incorporated. (Peterson, John)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Thomas Industrial Coatings, Incorporated.(Peterson, John)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Tennessee Valley Painters Health Fund. Thomas Industrial Coatings, Incorporated served on 11/29/2018. (Jennings, R.)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/26/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
November 21, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for R. Jan Jennings, Karla M. Campbell. (am)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Thomas Industrial Coatings, Incorporated.(Service packets to be picked by the Attorney at the front counter.) (am)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (am) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/21/2018) (am). Modified Text on 11/21/2018 (am).
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas Industrial Coatings, Incorporated (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2801963), filed by Tennessee Valley Painters Health Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennessee Valley Painters Health Fund v. Thomas Industrial Coatings, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Valley Painters Health Fund
Represented By: Karla M. Campbell
Represented By: R. Jan Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Industrial Coatings, Incorporated
Represented By: John W. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?