Asurion, LLC v. SquareTrade, Inc.

Plaintiff: Asurion, LLC
Defendant: SquareTrade, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01306
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
0 Judge: William L Campbell
1 Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 37 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Asurion, LLC. (Thompson, Overton)
January 17, 2019 36 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulated ESI Order by Asurion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Stipulated Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information)(Thompson, Overton)
January 17, 2019 35 Joint MOTION for Entry of Consent Protective Order by Asurion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order)(Thompson, Overton)
January 15, 2019 34 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SquareTrade, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment to SquareTrade Business Entity Disclosure)(Wilson, Joshua)
January 15, 2019 Notice to filer re DE 33 : Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 167-1, Section 8, electronically filed documents shall set forth the Filing User's name, address, telephone number and Board of Professional Responsibility registration number. The filer's name should be typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear preceded by the symbol "s/" or inserted facsimile signature. Counsel shall re-file the document. (mg)
January 14, 2019 33 ***DISREGARD*** BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SquareTrade, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Attachment to SquareTrade Business Entity Disclosure)(Wilson, Joshua) Modified text on 1/15/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 32 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by SquareTrade, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A: Full Page T-Mobile Ad, #2 Exhibit Ex. B: Schwab Ad, #3 Exhibit Ex. C: Wells Fargo Ad)(Wilson, Joshua)
January 14, 2019 31 MEMORANDUM in Support of #30 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by SquareTrade, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A: Squaretrade Pamphlet)(Wilson, Joshua)
January 14, 2019 30 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by SquareTrade, Inc.. (Wilson, Joshua)
January 9, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Joshua D. Wilson and Richard S. Busch. (mg)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order 29 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. #18 ) of Michael A. Berta is GRANTED. Signed by VICKI R. KINKADE, ACTING CLERK OF COURT on 1/9/2019. (mg)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order 28 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. #17 ) of Katelyn E. Rey is GRANTED. Signed by VICKI R. KINKADE, ACTING CLERK OF COURT on 1/9/2019. (mg)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order 27 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. #16 ) of Douglas A. Winthrop is GRANTED. Signed by VICKI R. KINKADE, ACTING CLERK OF COURT on 1/9/2019. (mg)
January 4, 2019 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Busch on behalf of SquareTrade, Inc. (Busch, Richard)
January 4, 2019 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D. Wilson on behalf of SquareTrade, Inc. (Wilson, Joshua)
January 4, 2019 24 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Katelyn Rey from the United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by SquareTrade, Inc.. (Wilson, Joshua)
January 4, 2019 23 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Douglas A. Winthrop from the United States District Court for the 9th Circuit of California filed by SquareTrade, Inc.. (Wilson, Joshua)
January 4, 2019 22 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Michael Berta from the United States District Court for the 9th Circuit of California filed by SquareTrade, Inc.. (Wilson, Joshua)
December 28, 2018 21 RECEIPT #34675053140 in the amount of $100 posted by SquareTrade, Inc. re #18 Motion for Michael A. Berta to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (mg)
December 28, 2018 20 RECEIPT #34675053139 in the amount of $100 posted by SquareTrade, Inc. re #17 Motion for Katelyn E. Rey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (mg)
December 28, 2018 19 RECEIPT #34675053138 in the amount of $100 posted by SquareTrade, Inc. re #16 Motion for Douglas A. Winthrop to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (mg)
December 27, 2018 CA State Bar status verified as active for Douglas A. Winthrop, Katelyn E. Rey, & Michael A. Berta. (af)
December 26, 2018 18 MOTION for attorney Michael A. Berta to Appear Pro Hac Vice w/ attached Certificate of Standing from the State Bar of CA. (Fee paid) by SquareTrade, Inc. (COUNSEL SHALL FILE A CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING FROM A U.S. DISTRICT COURT OR U.S. APPELLATE COURT WITHIN 10 DAYS - DUE 1/7/19) (af)
December 26, 2018 17 MOTION for attorney Katelyn E. Rey to Appear Pro Hac Vice w/ attached Certificate of Standing from the State Bar of CA. (Fee paid) by SquareTrade, Inc. (COUNSEL SHALL FILE A CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING FROM A U.S. DISTRICT COURT OR U.S. APPELLATE COURT WITHIN 10 DAYS - DUE 1/7/19) (af)
December 26, 2018 16 MOTION for attorney Douglas A. Winthrop to Appear Pro Hac Vice w/ attached Certificate of Standing from the State Bar of CA. (Fee paid) by SquareTrade, Inc. (COUNSEL SHALL FILE A CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING FROM A U.S. DISTRICT COURT OR U.S. APPELLATE COURT WITHIN 10 DAYS - DUE 1/7/19) (af)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 15 ORDER granting #14 Defendant's requested extension of time to answer or otherwise respond. Upon the parties' stipulation, the time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this case is extended to and including JANUARY 14, 2019. The initial case management conference remains scheduled for January 23, 2019 #8 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/14/2018. (BH)
December 13, 2018 14 MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by SquareTrade, Inc.. (Wilson, Joshua) Modified text on 12/13/2018 (mg).
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Erica C. Chanin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/28/2018. (mg)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for R. Charles Henn, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/28/2018. (mg)
November 28, 2018 11 RECEIPT #34675052759 in the amount of $200.00 posted by Asurion, LLC re #10 Erica C. Chanin's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and #9 R. Charles Henn, Jr.'s Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (mg)
November 28, 2018 10 MOTION for attorney(s) Erica C. Chanin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ($100 Fee Paid) by Asurion, LLC. (mg)
November 28, 2018 9 MOTION for attorney R. Charles Henn, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ($100 Fee Paid) by Asurion, LLC. (mg)
November 28, 2018 8 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is RESET for 1/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/26/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
November 26, 2018 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Asurion, LLC. SquareTrade, Inc. served on 11/26/2018. (Thompson, Overton)
November 26, 2018 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2019 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
November 26, 2018 4 Summons issued as to SquareTrade, Inc. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (mg)
November 26, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL R. Charles Henn, Jr, and Erica C. Chanin: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/17/2018. (mg)
November 26, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Overton Thompson, III, and GA State Bar status verified as active for R. Charles Henn, Jr, and Erica C. Chanin. (mg)
November 26, 2018 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
November 21, 2018 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Asurion, LLC. (af)
November 21, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Asurion, LLC against SquareTrade, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2802766). (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asurion, LLC v. SquareTrade, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asurion, LLC
Represented By: Erica C. Chanin
Represented By: Overton Thompson, III
Represented By: R. Charles Henn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SquareTrade, Inc.
Represented By: Richard S. Busch
Represented By: Joshua D. Wilson
Represented By: Michael A. Berta
Represented By: Katelyn E. Rey
Represented By: Douglas A. Winthrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?