Hamilton v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Lisa A. Hamilton
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2018cv01309
Filed: November 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney on 12/10/18. (gb)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed Social Security Administration served on 12/3/2018. (gb)
December 12, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon. (gb)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon on behalf of Social Security Administration (Maynor-Faulcon, Mercedes)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Forward to the USM for service.) (gb)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis ( #3 ) is GRANTED. This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for a scheduling order, for decision on all nondispositive matters, and for a Report and Recommendation on disposition of Plaintiff's Complaint for judicial review of the decision of the Social Security Administration. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/27/18. (gb)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
November 26, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Grayson Smith Cannon. (gb)
November 24, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Lisa A. Hamilton. (gb)
November 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Grayson Smith Cannon on behalf of Lisa A. Hamilton. (gb)
November 24, 2018 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Lisa A. Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa A. Hamilton
Represented By: Grayson Smith Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?