Stolt v. Freeman Webb Incorporated

Plaintiff: Troy Stolt
Defendant: Freeman Webb Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2018cv01315
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Alistair Newbern
1 Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: On January 22, 2019, Counsel for Defendant informed the Court that the parties reached a settlement and will file a stipulation and order of dismissal within 14 days. The initial case management conference set on January 29, 2019 is CANCELLED. There is nothing further to be done in this matter by the undersigned. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to return the file to the District Judge for his consideration of the proposed order of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/22/19. (dt)
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service filed by Freeman Webb Incorporated re #8 Business Entity Disclosure Statement filed by Freeman Webb Incorporated. (Pierce, Douglas)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service filed by Freeman Webb Incorporated re #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Freeman Webb Incorporated. (Pierce, Douglas)
December 27, 2018 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard Liebowitz: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 1/17/2019. (dt)
December 27, 2018 Notice to Filer re DE #7 and #8 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, all filings shall include a Certificate of Service and it shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel SHALL FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for these documents using the Certificate event located under Other Documents. (dt)
December 27, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Douglas Ray Pierce. (dt)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Freeman Webb Incorporated. (Pierce, Douglas)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Ray Pierce on behalf of Freeman Webb Incorporated (Pierce, Douglas)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/27/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Freeman Webb Incorporated. (Service copies will be picked up by counsel.) (dt)
November 27, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard Liebowitz: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/18/2018. (dt)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
November 27, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for James R. Wiggington. NY State Bar status verified as active for Richard Liebowitz. (dt)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Freeman Webb Incorporated (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2804307), filed by Troy Stolt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photo of Infringed Work, #2 Exhibit B - Copyright Public Catalog Result, #3 Exhibit C - Photo of Infringing Work, #4 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stolt v. Freeman Webb Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeman Webb Incorporated
Represented By: Douglas Ray Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Stolt
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Represented By: James R. Wiggington
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?