Jackson v. Southwest Airlines Co. et al
Plaintiff: Vanessa Jackson
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co. and The United States Federal Aviation Administration
Case Number: 3:2018cv01343
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 3/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/31/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Southwest Airlines Co.. (Feigelson, David)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Vanessa Jackson. (Schroeck, Christopher)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Southwest Airlines Co.. (Feigelson, David)
January 2, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for David I. Feigelson. (am)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Southwest Airlines Co..(Feigelson, David)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David I. Feigelson on behalf of Southwest Airlines Co. (Feigelson, David)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/7/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Southwest Airlines Co., The United States Federal Aviation Administration. (Service packet sent to attorney Christopher Schroeck by regular mail.) (am)
December 6, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher James Schroeck, J. Britt Phillips. (am)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Southwest Airlines Co., The United States Federal Aviation Administration (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2809337), filed by Vanessa Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Claim for Damages, #3 Exhibit B - FedEx Tracking)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Southwest Airlines Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Jackson
Represented By: Christopher James Schroeck
Represented By: J. Britt Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Represented By: David I. Feigelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Federal Aviation Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?