Swisher v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Andrea Swisher
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2018cv01356
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 72 of the FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), this case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for a scheduling order, for decision on all nondispositive matters, and for a Report and Recommendation on disposition of Plaintiff's Complaint for judicial review of the decision of the Social Security Administration. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/26/2018. (mg)
December 26, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon. (mg)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon on behalf of Social Security Administration (Maynor-Faulcon, Mercedes)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Andrea Swisher. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment SUMMONS - U.S. Attorney, #2 Attachment SUMMONS - US ATTORNEY GENERAL)(Williamson, Michael)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/18/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 138, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to Judge Eli Richardson for all purposes. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/14/18. (dt)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
December 10, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael Patrick Williamson. (mg)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2812058), filed by Andrea Swisher. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swisher v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Swisher
Represented By: Michael Patrick Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?