Turner v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Turner
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. and Nissan North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01361
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. No. #31 ). The Notice was filed prior to Defendant filing an answer or motion for summary judgment. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), therefore, the Notice sufficed to dismiss this action without any action on the part of the Court. The Notice states that dismissal is without prejudice, and therefore under Rule 41(a)(1)(B), the dismissal is without prejudice. Accordingly, the Court acknowledges that this action has been DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE effective as of the time of the filing of the Notice, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 1/7/2019. (jm)
January 4, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for John S. Hicks. (jm)
December 31, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Turner (Stranch, James)
December 28, 2018 Filing 30 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Carpenter, Brigid)
December 28, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint "Unopposed" by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order Granting Motion to Ext. Deadline to File Response to Pleading)(Carpenter, Brigid)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Adam J. Levitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade on 12/20/2018. (jw)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Daniel R. Ferri to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade on 12/20/2018. (jw)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #16 Motion for John E. Tangren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade on 12/20/2018. (jw)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Kim E. Richman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade on 12/20/2018. (jw)
December 20, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Kim Richman from the United States District Court for the Eastern of New York filed by David Turner. (Stranch, James)
December 20, 2018 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney John E. Tangren from the United States District Court for the Northern of Illinois filed by David Turner. (Stranch, James)
December 20, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Daniel R. Ferri from the United States District Court for the Northern of Illinois filed by David Turner. (Stranch, James)
December 20, 2018 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Adam J. Levitt from the United States District Court for the Northern of Illinois filed by David Turner. (Stranch, James)
December 20, 2018 The pending pro hac vice motions at DE 16,17,&18 do not include a Certificate of Good Standing from a U. S. District Court or a U.S. appellate court. The proper certificates should be filed with 10 days (due 12/30/18). (af)
December 20, 2018 The pending pro hac vice motion at DE 8 for attorney Kim Richman does not include a Certificate of Good Standing from a U. S. District Court or a U.S. appellate court. The proper certificate should be filed with 10 days (due 12/30/18). (af)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. #7 ) of W. Daniel Dee Miles, III is GRANTED. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade, Acting Clerk of Court on 12/19/2018. (jm)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. #6 ) of H. Clay Barnett, III is GRANTED. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade, Acting Clerk of Court on 12/19/2018. (jm)
December 18, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Adam J. Levitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2818303) by David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration Adam J. Levitt, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stranch, James) Modified on 12/19/2018 (jm).
December 18, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney Daniel R. Ferri to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2818284) by David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Daniel R. Ferri, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stranch, James) Modified on 12/19/2018 (jm).
December 18, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney John E. Tangren to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2818267) by David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of John E. Tangren, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stranch, James) Modified on 12/19/2018 (jm).
December 18, 2018 Filing 15 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed as to #4 Summons Issued Nissan North America, Inc., served on 12/13/18. Acknowledgement filed by David Turner. (Stranch, James) Modified on 12/19/2018 (jm).
December 18, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (jm)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). All existing case management dates, deadlines, and trial settings remain in effect, pending further order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/18/2018. (jm)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 DECLARATION of W. Daniel "Dee" Miles, III filed by David Turner re: #7 MOTION for attorney W. Daniel "Dee" Miles, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2815782). (Stranch, James) Modified on 12/18/2018 (jm).
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Kim E. Richman filed by David Turner re: #8 MOTION for attorney Kim E. Richman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2815785). (Stranch, James) Modified on 12/18/2018 (jm).
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 DECLARATION of H. Clay Barnett, III filed by David Turner re: #6 MOTION for attorney H. Clay Barnett, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2815766). (Stranch, James) Modified on 12/18/2018 (jm).
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 138, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to Judge Eli Richardson for all purposes. All present deadlines and court dates shall remain in place, subject to modification by Judge Richardson or the magistrate judge. The initial case management conference scheduled before Judge Trauger on February 11, 2019 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/14/2018. (jm)
December 14, 2018 The pending pro hac vice motions (Docket Numbers #6 , #7 , and #8 ) do not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney, and if so, providing complete details about the proceeding or charges, including outcome. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (jm)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney(s) Kim E. Richman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2815785) by David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Stranch, James)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney(s) W. Daniel "Dee" Miles, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2815782) by David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Stranch, James)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney(s) H. Clay Barnett, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2815766) by David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stranch, James)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2019 at 02:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jm)
December 12, 2018 WV State Bar status verified as active for Benjamin L. Bailey and Jonathan D. Boggs; DC Bar status verified as active for Michael L. Murphy and Jeffrey Kaliel; NY State Bar status verified as active for Daniel A. Schlanger and Kim E. Richman; TN State Bar status verified as active for James Gerard Stranch, IV, Benjamin A. Gastel, and Tricia Herzfeld; AL State Bar status verified as active for W. Daniel Miles, III, and H. Clay Barnett, III; IL State Bar status verified as active for Adam J. Levitt, John E. Tangren, and Daniel R. Ferri. (jm) Modified on 12/14/2018 (jm).
December 12, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Benjamin L. Bailey, Jonathan D. Boggs, Michael L. Murphy, Daniel A. Schlanger, Kim E. Richman, Jeffrey Kaliel, W. Daniel Miles, III, H. Clay Barnett, III, Adam J. Levitt, John E. Tangren, and Daniel R. Ferri: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 1/2/2019. (jm)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Nissan North America, Inc. (Service copies will be picked up by counsel.) (jm)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., and Nissan North America, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2813124), filed by David Turner. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet) (jm) Modified on 12/12/2018 (jm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Turner
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Michael L. Murphy
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Jonathan D. Boggs
Represented By: Jeffrey Kaliel
Represented By: Daniel R. Ferri
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Benjamin L. Bailey
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: Tricia Herzfeld
Represented By: Daniel A. Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: John S. Hicks
Represented By: Brigid M. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?