Jackson County Employees' Retirement System v. Ghosn et al

Plaintiff: Jackson County Employees' Retirement System
Defendant: Hiroto Saikawa, Carlos Ghosn, Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Joseph G. Peter, Greg Kelly and Hiroshi Karube
Case Number: 3:2018cv01368
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
0 Judge: William L Campbell
1 Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Jerry E. Martin filed by Jackson County Employees' Retirement System re: #25 MOTION For An Order Authorizing Alternative Service on Defendants Carlos Ghosn and Greg Kelly . (Wood, Christopher)
February 7, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Christopher M. Wood filed by Jackson County Employees' Retirement System re: #25 MOTION For An Order Authorizing Alternative Service on Defendants Carlos Ghosn and Greg Kelly . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - January 23, 2019 New York Times Article, #2 Exhibit B - January 15, 2019 Bloomberg Article, #3 Exhibit C - January 15, 2019 Wall Street Journal Article, #4 Exhibit D - January 8, 2019 Wall Street Journal Article, #5 Exhibit E - January 9, 2019 Jakarta Post Article, #6 Exhibit F - November 25, 2018 Wall Street Journal Article, #7 Exhibit G - Biography of Brad S. Karp, #8 Exhibit H - November 26, 2018 Tennessean Article, #9 Exhibit I - December 25, 2018 Associated Press Article, #10 Exhibit J - Biography of Aubrey B. Harwell, Jr., #11 Exhibit K - December 26, 2018 Reuters Article, #12 Exhibit L - January 11, 2019 Tennessean Article, #13 Exhibit M - New York State Unified Court System Registration of Yoichi Kitamura, #14 Exhibit N - December 2018 E-mails Between Counsel, #15 Exhibit O - January 22, 2019 Letter to Ghosn's Counsel)(Wood, Christopher)
February 7, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support of #25 MOTION For An Order Authorizing Alternative Service on Defendants Carlos Ghosn and Greg Kelly filed by Jackson County Employees' Retirement System Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Application for an Order Authorizing Alternative Service on Defendants Carlos Ghosn and Greg Kelly. (Wood, Christopher)
February 7, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION For An Order Authorizing Alternative Service on Defendants Carlos Ghosn and Greg Kelly by Jackson County Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Christopher)
February 7, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION re #5 Notice of Case Management Conference Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference by Jackson County Employees' Retirement System. (Wood, Christopher)
January 24, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS returned executed by Jackson County Employees' Retirement System. Joseph G. Peter served on 12/22/2018. (Wood, Christopher)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. 20) of Christopher S. Turner is GRANTED. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade on 1/15/2019. (jw)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. 19) of Peter A. Wald is GRANTED. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade on 1/15/2019. (jw)
January 14, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Overton Thompson, III and Joseph B. Crace, Jr.; CA State Bar status verified as active for Peter A. Wald; DC Bar status verified as active for Christopher S. Turner. (jw)
January 11, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for attorney(s) Christopher S. Turner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2830684) by Joseph G. Peter. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Declaration of Christopher S. Turner, #2 Attachment - Proposed Order)(Thompson, Overton)
January 11, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney(s) Peter A. Wald to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2830680) by Joseph G. Peter. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Declaration of Peter A. Wald, #2 Attachment - Proposed Order)(Thompson, Overton)
January 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph B. Crace, Jr on behalf of Joseph G. Peter (Crace, Joseph)
January 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Overton Thompson, III on behalf of Joseph G. Peter (Thompson, Overton)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Regarding Defendant Joseph G. Peter's Response to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/9/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Mary K. Blasy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade on 1/9/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Samuel H. Rudman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade on 1/9/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
January 7, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Defendant Joseph G. Peter's Response to the Complaint by Jackson County Employees' Retirement System. (Wood, Christopher)
December 27, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney(s) Mary K. Blasy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2822587) by Jackson County Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration with Certificate of Good Standing)(Wood, Christopher)
December 27, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney(s) Samuel H. Rudman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2822583) by Jackson County Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration with Certificate of Good Standing)(Wood, Christopher)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. 6) of Darren J. Robbins is GRANTED. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade on 12/19/2018. (jw)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Jackson County Employees' Retirement System. Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. served on 12/13/2018. (Wood, Christopher)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/17/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jackson County Employees' Retirement System. (Martin, Jerry)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney(s) Darren J. Robbins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2815787) by Jackson County Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Darren J. Robbins)(Wood, Christopher)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jw)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Carlos Ghosn, Hiroshi Karube, Greg Kelly, Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Joseph G. Peter, Hiroto Saikawa. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw)
December 12, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Darren J. Robbins, Samuel H. Rudman, Mary K. Blasy: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 1/2/2019. (jw)
December 12, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jerry E. Martin and Christopher M. Wood; CA Bar Status verified as active for Darren J. Robbins; NY State Bar Status verified as active for Samuel H. Rudman and Mary K. Blasy. (jw)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carlos Ghosn, Hiroshi Karube, Greg Kelly, Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Joseph G. Peter, Hiroto Saikawa (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2813117), filed by Jackson County Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson County Employees' Retirement System v. Ghosn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiroto Saikawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Ghosn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph G. Peter
Represented By: Peter A. Wald
Represented By: Overton Thompson, III
Represented By: Christopher S. Turner
Represented By: Joseph B. Crace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiroshi Karube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson County Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Jerry E. Martin
Represented By: Christopher M. Wood
Represented By: Mary K. Blasy
Represented By: Samuel H. Rudman
Represented By: Darren J. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?