Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund et al v. Wise Business Forms, Incorporated

Plaintiff: Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund and Board of Trustees of the Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund
Defendant: Wise Business Forms, Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2018cv01372
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
1 Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 3/25/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (am)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 2/8/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
February 8, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Douglas Ray Pierce. (am)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wise Business Forms, Incorporated. (Pierce, Douglas)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Ray Pierce on behalf of Wise Business Forms, Incorporated (Pierce, Douglas)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund. (Hamilton, William)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund, Board of Trustees of the Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund. Wise Business Forms, Incorporated waiver sent on 1/4/2019. (Roth, Andrew)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Andrew D. Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade, Acting Clerk of Court on 12/28/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Andrew D. Roth filed by Board of Trustees of the Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund, Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund re: #5 MOTION for attorney(s) Andrew Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2817576). (Roth, Andrew)
December 20, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION re PHV motion filed at DE 5: Because Andrew Roth did not sign the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, he is directed to file a declaration regarding no disciplinary proceedings pending against him. The declaration should be filed within 10 business days. (due 1/2/19) (af)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney(s) Andrew Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2817576) by Board of Trustees of the Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund, Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment certificate of good standing)(Hamilton, William)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (am)
December 17, 2018 TN & DC State Bar status verified as active for William Michael Hamilton, Andrew D. Roth. (am)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wise Business Forms, Incorporated (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2816894), filed by Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund, Board of Trustees of the Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund et al v. Wise Business Forms, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wise Business Forms, Incorporated
Represented By: Douglas Ray Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund
Represented By: Andrew D. Roth
Represented By: William Michael Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund
Represented By: Andrew D. Roth
Represented By: William Michael Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?