Bigsby v. United States of America
Petitioner: Samuel Bigsby
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv01396
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE Motion to Dismiss Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 for Untimeliness. (Koshy, Sunny)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE filed by United States of America re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Samuel Bigsby . (Suedekum, J.)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: the Clerk is DIRECTED to serve a copy of the motion and this Order on the United States Attorney. The United States SHALL file an answer within 30 days of the date of entry of this order. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/22/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail and United States Attorney via mailbox.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
January 3, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by United States of America. (Suedekum, J.) Modified on 1/3/2019 (dt).
January 2, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (afs)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Samuel Bigsby. (afs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bigsby v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Brent Adams Hannafan
Represented By: J. Christopher Suedekum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samuel Bigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?