Owen et al v. Capital Accounts, LLC

Plaintiff: Robert Owens, Darla Owen and Robert Owen
Defendant: Capital Accounts, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00025
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing that Defendant was duly served with a copy of the Summons and Complaint in this matter, and it further appearing that Defendant has failed to plead or otherwise defend this action and more than twenty-one days have passed since the Defendant has been served, the Clerk finds that entry of default is appropriate. Accordingly, upon request of the Plaintiff, default is hereby entered against Defendant Capital Accounts, LLC pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade, Acting Clerk of Court on 3/5/2019. (Capital Accounts, LLC sent a copy of the order by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. The parties shall contact the Magistrate Judge's chambers within seven days of Defendant's appearance in this action to reschedule the initial case management conference at a mutually convenient date and time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/27/19. (dt)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference Deadline by Darla Owen, Robert Owen. (Kerney, Frank)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Capital Accounts, LLC by Darla Owen. (Kerney, Frank)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Robert Owen, Darla Owen. Capital Accounts, LLC served on 1/9/2019. (Kerney, Frank)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/9/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Capital Accounts, LLC. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
January 8, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Zachary D. Wiley and Frank H. Kerney, III. (dt)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital Accounts, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2826565), filed by Robert Owens, Darla Owen. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owen et al v. Capital Accounts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Owens
Represented By: Frank H. Kerney, III
Represented By: Zachary D. Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darla Owen
Represented By: Frank H. Kerney, III
Represented By: Zachary D. Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Owen
Represented By: Frank H. Kerney, III
Represented By: Zachary D. Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Accounts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?