Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Back Roads Bar and Grill, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Benefit Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Lord and Walker Publishing, MJ Publishing Trust, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Combine Music Corp., Gregmark Music, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Arc/Conrad Music LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Springtime Music, Inc., Showbilly Music and Fourteenth Hour Music, Inc.
Defendant: Back Roads Bar and Grill, Inc. and Victoria Amber Radford
Case Number: 3:2019cv00028
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
1 Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Conference by Arc/Conrad Music LLC, Benefit Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Combine Music Corp., Concord Music Group, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Fourteenth Hour Music, Inc., Gregmark Music, Inc., Lord and Walker Publishing, MJ Publishing Trust, Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Showbilly Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Springtime Music, Inc.. (Webb, Abigail)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Arc/Conrad Music LLC, Benefit Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Combine Music Corp., Concord Music Group, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Fourteenth Hour Music, Inc., Gregmark Music, Inc., Lord and Walker Publishing, MJ Publishing Trust, Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Showbilly Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Springtime Music, Inc. re Annotation - Not Admitted, Regarding Admission of Counsel Laura Martin (Webb, Abigail)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/9/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (jw)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Back Roads Bar and Grill, Inc. and Victoria Amber Radford. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Laura Martin: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 1/29/2019. (jw)
January 8, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Abigail Jones Webb and Laura Martin. (jw)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Arc/Conrad Music LLC, Benefit Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Combine Music Corp., Concord Music Group, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Fourteenth Hour Music, Inc., Gregmark Music, Inc., Lord and Walker Publishing, MJ Publishing Trust, Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Showbilly Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Springtime Music, Inc.. (Webb, Abigail)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Back Roads Bar and Grill, Inc., Victoria Amber Radford (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2826817), filed by Songs of Universal, Inc., Benefit Music, Fourteenth Hour Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Arc/Conrad Music LLC, Springtime Music, Inc., Showbilly Music, Lord and Walker Publishing, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Gregmark Music, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., MJ Publishing Trust, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Combine Music Corp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Song Schedule)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Back Roads Bar and Grill, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Martin
Represented By: Abigail Jones Webb
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benefit Music
Represented By: Laura Martin
Represented By: Abigail Jones Webb
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Laura Martin
Represented By: Abigail Jones Webb
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lord and Walker Publishing
Represented By: Laura Martin
Represented By: Abigail Jones Webb
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MJ Publishing Trust
Represented By: Laura Martin
Represented By: Abigail Jones Webb
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Martin
Represented By: Abigail Jones Webb
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Combine Music Corp.
Represented By: Laura Martin
Represented By: Abigail Jones Webb
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregmark Music, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Martin
Represented By: Abigail Jones Webb
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Martin
Represented By: Abigail Jones Webb
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concord Music Group, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Martin
Represented By: Abigail Jones Webb
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arc/Conrad Music LLC
Represented By: Laura Martin
Represented By: Abigail Jones Webb
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Martin
Represented By: Abigail Jones Webb
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Springtime Music, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Martin
Represented By: Abigail Jones Webb
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Showbilly Music
Represented By: Laura Martin
Represented By: Abigail Jones Webb
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fourteenth Hour Music, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Martin
Represented By: Abigail Jones Webb
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Back Roads Bar and Grill, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Amber Radford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?