McKissick v. AETNA Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Joseph T McKissick
Defendant: AETNA Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00060
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. #12 ) of Grace Robinson Murphy is GRANTED. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade, Acting Clerk of Court on 3/8/2019. (jm)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by AETNA Life Insurance Company. (Murphy, Grace)
March 6, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#12 : This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word of WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (jm)
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Grace R. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2865691) by AETNA Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing)(Murphy, Grace)
February 28, 2019 AL State Bar status verified as active for Grace Robinson Murphy. (jm)
February 28, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Grace Robinson Murphy: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 3/21/2019. (jm)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AETNA Life Insurance Company.(Murphy, Grace)
February 5, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for William B. Wahlheim, Jr and Marshall T. Cook. (jm)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. AETNA Life Insurance Company answer is due by 2/26/2019. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/4/2019. (jm)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AETNA Life Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Responsive Pleading by AETNA Life Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for March 11, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. is RESET for the same day at 1:15 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/29/2019. (jm)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Joseph T McKissick. AETNA Life Insurance Company served on 1/15/2019. (Pepper, J.)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 02:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jm)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to AETNA Life Insurance Company. (Service copies will be picked up by counsel.) (jm)
January 10, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Ross Pepper, Jr and Matthew E. Pulle. (jm)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AETNA Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2828194), filed by Joseph T McKissick. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKissick v. AETNA Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph T McKissick
Represented By: Matthew E. Pulle
Represented By: J. Ross Pepper, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Represented By: Marshall T. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?