Phillips v. Pearl Corporation

Plaintiff: David Phillips
Defendant: Pearl Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00071
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/11/2019; ORDER to enter. (Tape #digital recording.) (jwc)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Pearl Corporation. (Parker, R.)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Pearl Corporation.(Parker, R.)
February 4, 2019 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard P. Liebowitz: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 2/25/2019. ***FAILURE TO COMPLY WILL BE BROUGHT TO THE COURT'S ATTENTION***(af)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendant's unopposed motion to extend time to file a responsive pleading (Docket No. #10 ), which is GRANTED. Defendant shall have until March 6, 2019, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Absent further order, the initial case management conference remains scheduled for March 11, 2019, with a deadline of three (3) business days prior for filing of a joint proposed initial case management order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 2/1/2019. (jm)
February 1, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for R. Gregory Parker. (jm)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Other Responsive Pleading (Unopposed) by Pearl Corporation. (Parker, R.)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Gregory Parker on behalf of Pearl Corporation (Parker, R.)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED for 2:30 p.m, Monday, March 11, 2019, in Courtroom No. 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee. The stay of discovery remains in place, subject to any party filing a motion requesting that the stay be lifted. Plaintiff's counsel shall ensure that Defendant is served with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/30/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). All existing case management dates, deadlines, and trial settings remain in effect, pending further order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 1/18/2019. (jm)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 138, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to Judge Eli Richardson for all purposes. All present deadlines and court dates shall remain in place, subject to modification by Judge Richardson or the magistrate judge. The initial case management conference scheduled before Judge Trauger on March 25, 2019 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/17/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2019 at 01:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jm)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Pearl Corporation. (Service copies will be picked up by counsel.) (jm)
January 11, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard P. Liebowitz: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 2/1/2019. (jm)
January 11, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for James R. Wiggington; NY State Bar status verified as active for Richard P. Liebowitz. (jm)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pearl Corporation (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 2830293), filed by David Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Infringed Work, #3 Exhibit B - Infringing Work) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Pearl Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearl Corporation
Represented By: R. Gregory Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Phillips
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Represented By: James R. Wiggington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?